SB261 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Kieckhefer, Segerblom, Farley, Cancela, Denis, Ratti, Spearman, Woodhouse, Yeager, Brooks, Carlton, Bilbray-Axelrod, Cohen, Fumo, Swank

Revises provisions governing prescribing, dispensing and administering controlled substances designed to end the life of a patient. (BDR 40-17)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 29, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 749   

Bill History

Mar 13, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 749.) To printer.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)