[Rev. 6/2/2018 8:21:16 AM]

 

RESOLUTIONS AND MEMORIALS

________

 

No.

Title

Page

1

Assembly Concurrent Resolution. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 1–Joint Committee of Agriculture and Livestock.

499

2

Assembly Joint Resolution, memorializing Congress and the national selective service board to delay the induction into the military forces of the United States of registrants actually engaged in the agricultural and livestock industries, and to declare these to be critical industries. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 3–Joint Committees on Agriculture and Livestock.

500

3

Assembly Concurrent Resolution. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 5–Messrs. Covington and Boak.

501

4

Assembly Concurrent Resolution. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 4–Mr. Strosnider.

502

5

Assembly Concurrent Resolution. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 7–Mr. Munk.

502

6

Assembly Concurrent Resolution. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 8–Mr. McElroy.

502

7

Assembly Concurrent Resolution, commending the patriotism and industry of Nevada citizens in sales of government war bonds. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 9–Mr. Fairchild.

502

8

Assembly Joint Resolution, memorializing the Congress of the United States to amend the social security act to permit old-age pensioners to earn wages without penalty. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 10–Mr. Carlson.  Approved February 28, 1945.

503

9

Assembly Joint Resolution. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 8–Mr. Miller.  Approved February 28, 1945.

504

10

Assembly Joint Resolution, proposing an amendment to section 11 of article XV of the constitution of the State of Nevada. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 7 of the Forty-first Session–Washoe County Delegation.

505

11

Assembly Joint Resolution, to the California legislature of 1945, asking the State of California to cede the territory east of the summit of the Sierras to Nevada, by a plebiscite of the residents of that area. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 1–Mr. Crawford.

506

12

Assembly Concurrent Resolution, relative to “Bowers’ Mansion.” Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 10–Mr. McElroy.

507

13

Senate Concurrent Resolution. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 2–Senator Cox.

508

14

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the president of the United States and the Congress to make changes in existing unfavorable laws and regulations affecting the mining industry and to make new beneficial laws and regulations. Senate Joint Resolution No. 10–Senator Tognoni.  Approved March 7, 1945.

509

15

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the president of the United States and the Congress to make changes in existing unfavorable laws and regulations affecting the mining industry in technical mining investigations, and to make new beneficial laws. Senate Joint Resolution No. 5–Senator Tognoni.  Approved March 7, 1945.

510

16

Senate Concurrent Resolution, creating an interim board for the purpose of preserving and protecting the Nevada state postwar reserve fund. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 1–Senators Johnson and Cox.

511

17

Assembly Concurrent Resolution, calling to the attention of the regional forester, intermountain region, forest highway service, and the state highway engineer the need for immediate construction of forest highway route No. 16, extending from the junction with U S 50 near Edgewood, Lake Tahoe, Nevada, easterly to the junction with U. S. highway 395 near Minden. Assembly Substitute for Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 11–Mr. Hussman.

512

18

Senate Concurrent Resolution, providing for fact-finding committee to investigate civil service features and retirement for state government employees, providing for the appointment of a joint committee of the senate and the assembly to conduct such fact-finding investigations, authorizing and empowering such committee to do all things necessary and proper to the efficient conduct of such investigations and requiring a report by such joint committee to the Nevada state legislature at its next regular session, together with any recommendations it may deem advisable in connection therewith. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 6–Senator Robbins.

513

19

Assembly Concurrent Resolution, authorizing and directing the appointment of a joint interim committee to study the need for legislation referring to aviation and aeronautics; requiring that a report be made by such committee to the forty-third session of the Nevada legislature; providing for the expenses of said committee, and other matters connected therewith. Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 12–Mr. Free.

514

20

Senate Concurrent Resolution, directing the state controller, as ex officio insurance commissioner of the State of Nevada, to make a study and investigation of laws relating to the control, regulation, or taxation of the business of insurance, and to report his findings and conclusions, and recommend proposed legislation for the control, regulation, or taxation of the business of insurance to the next succeeding regular session of the Nevada state legislature. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 8–Judiciary Committee.

515

21

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the president and the Congress to support a policy of free immigration of Jewish people to Palestine. Senate Joint Resolution No. 12–Committee on Federal Relations.  Approved March 21, 1945.

516

22

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the Congress of the United States on the subject of postwar military establishment of the status of the national guard. Senate Joint Resolution No. 11–Committee on Military and Indian Affairs.

517

23

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the president of the United States and the Congress to make changes in existing unfavorable laws and regulations affecting the mining industry, and to make new beneficial laws. Senate Joint Resolution No. 8–Senator Tognoni.  Approved March 21, 1945.

519

24

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the president of the United States and the Congress to make changes in existing unfavorable laws and regulations affecting the mining industry, and to make new beneficial laws. Senate Joint Resolution No. 7–Senator Tognoni.  Approved March 21, 1945.

520

25

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the president of the United States and the Congress to make changes in existing unfavorable laws and regulations affecting the gold mining industry, and to make new beneficial laws. Senate Joint Resolution No. 9–Senator Tognoni.  Approved March 21, 1945.

521

26

Assembly Joint Resolution. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 7–Churchill County Delegation.  Approved March 21, 1945.

522

27

Assembly Joint Resolution, memorializing Congress to rectify certain discriminatory legislation. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 5–Committee on Military and Indian Affairs.  Approved March 21, 1945.

523

28

Assembly Joint Resolution. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 15–Mr. Crawford.  Approved March 22, 1945.

524

29

Assembly Joint Resolution, memorializing Congress of the United States to amend the social security law to provide increased payments to old-age pensioners. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 11–Mr. Carlson.  Approved March 22, 1945.

524

30

Assembly Joint Resolution, memorializing county commissioners in the State of Nevada to assist in perpetuating historical landmarks. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 17–Mr. Folsom.  Approved March 22, 1945.

525

31

Assembly Joint Resolution. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 16–Mr. Jepson.

526

32

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing the Congress of the United States to enact legislation to preserve the forests of the nation. Senate Joint Resolution No. 2–Senators Farndale and Russell.

527

33

Senate Joint Resolution, memorializing Congress and the Nevada representatives in Congress to make possible the acquisition, by men and women discharged from the military service, of farms and homes in the State of Nevada. Senate Substitute for Senate Joint Resolution No. 13–Senator Farndale.  Approved March 22, 1945.

527

34

Assembly Joint Resolution. Assembly Joint Resolution No. 18–Mr. Beko.

529

35

Senate Concurrent Resolution. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 7–Senator Cox.

530

36

Senate Concurrent Resolution. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 4–Senate Committee on Mines and Mining.

530

37

Senate Concurrent Resolution. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 5–Senator Haight.

530

38

Senate Concurrent Resolution. Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 9–Senator Farndale.

530