2011-2012 Interim
New Method for Funding Public Schools (S.B. 11)

Summary 
Under existing law, the Nevada Plan for School Finance provides for the financial support of the school districts, charter schools and university schools for profoundly gifted pupils. Section 22 of S.B. 11 (2011) directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study concerning the development of a new method for funding public schools in Nevada.

Agendas and Minutes

Interim Study Report

Nevada Funding Adjustment Simulator

January 24, 2012 Meeting

March 2, 2012 Meeting

April 20, 2012 Meeting

August 14, 2012 Meeting

August 28, 2012 Meeting

REQUEST FOR PROPOSALS FOR A CONSULTANT(S) TO ASSIST IN THE STUDY OF A NEW METHOD OF FUNDING FOR PUBLIC SCHOOLS IN NEVADA

RESPONSES TO QUESTIONS RECEIVED REGARDING THE REQUEST FOR PROPOSALS FOR A CONSULTANT(S) TO ASSIST IN A STUDY OF A NEW METHOD FOR FUNDING PUBLIC SCHOOLS IN NEVADA

Study of a New Method of Funding for Public Schools in Nevada dated September 25, 2012