Events

Legislative committees and committees affiliated with the Legislature are displayed as links within the panels below.

The 35th (2023) Special Session of the Nevada Legislature adjourned sine die on June 14th, 2023.

The 83rd (2025) Session of the Nevada Legislature will begin on February 3, 2025.

Thursday, September 28, 2023

10:00 AM

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
This is the fourth meeting in calendar year 2023. The agenda is not yet available.
1:00 PM

Secretary of State Advisory Committee on Participatory Democracy
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
3:00 PM
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the sixth meeting in calendar year 2023. Please see agenda for details.
  
Monday, October 2, 2023

9:00 AM

Dept. of Taxation Nevada Tax Commission
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  
Thursday, October 5, 2023

9:30 AM

State Board of Equalization
  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  
Friday, October 6, 2023

9:30 AM

State Board of Equalization
  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  
Wednesday, October 11, 2023

9:00 AM

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
This is the seventh meeting in calendar year 2023. The agenda is not yet available.
  
Monday, December 4, 2023

9:00 AM

Dept. of Taxation Nevada Tax Commission
  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  
Tuesday, December 5, 2023

9:30 AM

  • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
This is the second meeting in calendar year 2023. The agenda is not yet available.
  
Wednesday, December 13, 2023

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the eighth meeting in calendar year 2023. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Tuesday, February 6, 2024

2:00 PM

  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the second meeting of the 2023-2025 Term. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, February 7, 2024

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the first meeting in calendar year 2024. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, April 10, 2024

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the second meeting in calendar year 2024. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Thursday, April 11, 2024

2:00 PM

  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the third meeting of the 2023-2025 Term. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, June 12, 2024

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the third meeting in calendar year 2024. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, August 14, 2024

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the fourth meeting in calendar year 2024. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Thursday, September 26, 2024

2:00 PM

  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the fourth meeting of the 2023-2025 Term. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, October 9, 2024

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the fifth meeting in calendar year 2024. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, November 20, 2024

2:00 PM

  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the sixth meeting of the 2023-2025 Term. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, December 11, 2024

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the sixth meeting in calendar year 2024. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, January 22, 2025

2:00 PM

  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the seventh meeting of the 2023-2025 Term. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.
  
Wednesday, January 29, 2025

9:00 AM

  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
This is the first meeting in calendar year 2025. The agenda is not yet available. The meeting location is subject to change.