78th (2015) Session

  Legislator Party District County
Atkinson, Kelvin image Atkinson, Kelvin
Co-Minority Whip
Democratic No. 4 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2002-2012. Served in the Nevada Senate 2012-2019
Brower, Greg image Brower, Greg
Republican No. 15 Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 1999-2002, and served in the Nevada Senate 2011-2016. Resigned February 20, 2016.
Denis, Moises (Mo) image Denis, Moises (Mo)
Democratic No. 2 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Farley, Patricia image Farley, Patricia
Republican No. 8 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Senate 2014-2018
Ford, Aaron D. image Ford, Aaron D.
Minority Leader
Democratic No. 11 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Senate 2012-2018.
Goicoechea, Pete image Goicoechea, Pete
Republican No. 19 Clark (Part), Elko, Eureka, Lincoln, Nye (Part), White Pine
Currently Serving
Gustavson, Donald (Don) G. image Gustavson, Donald (Don) G.
Republican No. 14 Esmeralda, Humboldt, Lander, Mineral, Nye (Part), Pershing, Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 1996-2004, and served in the Nevada Senate 2010-2018.
Hammond, Scott image Hammond, Scott
Co-Majority Whip
Republican No. 18 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Hardy, Joseph (Joe) P. image Hardy, Joseph (Joe) P.
President Pro Tempore
Republican No. 12 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Harris, Becky image Harris, Becky
Republican No. 9 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Senate 2014-2018. Resigned January 16, 2018.
Kieckhefer, Ben image Kieckhefer, Ben
Assistant Majority Leader
Republican No. 16 Carson City, Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Senate 2010-2021. Resigned October 7, 2021.
Kihuen, Ruben J. image Kihuen, Ruben J.
Co-Minority Whip
Democratic No. 10 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2007-2010, and served in the Nevada Senate 2011-2016. Resigned November 16, 2016.
Lipparelli, Mark image Lipparelli, Mark
Republican No. 6 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Senate 2015-2016.
Manendo, Mark A. image Manendo, Mark A.
Democratic No. 21 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 1994-2010, and served in the Nevada Senate 2010-2017. Resigned July 18, 2017.
Parks, David R. image Parks, David R.
Democratic No. 7 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 1996-2008, and served in the Nevada Senate 2008-2020.
Roberson, Michael image Roberson, Michael
Majority Leader
Republican No. 20 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Senate 2010-2018
Segerblom, Tick image Segerblom, Tick
Democratic No. 3 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2006-2012. Served in the Nevada Senate 2012-2018.
Settelmeyer, James A. image Settelmeyer, James A.
Co-Majority Whip
Republican No. 17 Churchill, Douglas, Lyon, Storey
Currently Serving
Smith, Debbie image Smith, Debbie
Assistant Minority Leader
Democratic No. 13 Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2001-2002 and 2004-2011, and served in the Nevada Senate 2013-2016. Deceased February 21, 2016.
Spearman, Pat image Spearman, Pat
Democratic No. 1 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Woodhouse, Joyce image Woodhouse, Joyce
Democratic No. 5 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Senate 2006-2010 and 2012-2020.