77th (2013) Session

  Legislator Party District County
Aizley, Paul image Aizley, Paul
Speaker Pro Tempore
Democratic No. 41 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2009-2014.
Anderson, Elliot T. image Anderson, Elliot T.
Democratic No. 15 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2010-2018
Anderson, Paul image Anderson, Paul
Republican No. 13 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2012-2017. Resigned September 22, 2017.
Benitez-Thompson, Teresa image Benitez-Thompson, Teresa
Democratic No. 27 Washoe (Part)
Currently Serving
Bobzien, David P. image Bobzien, David P.
Majority Whip
Democratic No. 24 Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2007-2014.
Bustamante Adams, Irene image Bustamante Adams, Irene
Democratic No. 42 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2010-2018
Carlton, Maggie image Carlton, Maggie
Democratic No. 14 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Carrillo, Richard image Carrillo, Richard
Democratic No. 18 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2010-2020.
Cohen, Lesley E. image Cohen, Lesley E.
Democratic No. 29 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Daly, Skip image Daly, Skip
Democratic No. 31 Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2010-2014 and 2016-2020.
Diaz, Olivia image Diaz, Olivia
Chief Deputy Whip
Democratic No. 11 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly from 2010 to 2018.
Dondero Loop, Marilyn image Dondero Loop, Marilyn
Democratic No. 5 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Duncan, Wesley image Duncan, Wesley
Republican No. 37 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2013-2014.
Eisen, Andy image Eisen, Andy
Democratic No. 21 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2013-2014.
Ellison, John image Ellison, John
Republican No. 33 Elko, Eureka, Lincoln (Part), White Pine
Currently Serving
Fiore, Michele image Fiore, Michele
Republican No. 4 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2013-2016.
Flores, Lucy image Flores, Lucy
Chief Deputy Whip
Democratic No. 28 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2011-2014.
Frierson, Jason image Frierson, Jason
Assistant Majority Floor Leader
Democratic No. 8 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Grady, Tom image Grady, Tom
Minority Whip
Republican No. 38 Churchill, Lyon (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2003-2014.
Hambrick, John image Hambrick, John
Republican No. 2 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2008-2020.
Hansen, Ira image Hansen, Ira
Republican No. 32 Esmeralda, Humboldt, Lander, Mineral, Nye (Part), Pershing, Washoe (Part)
Currently Serving
Hardy, Cresent image Hardy, Cresent
Assistant Minority Floor Leader
Republican No. 19 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2011-2014.
Healey, James image Healey, James
Democratic No. 35 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2013-2014.
Hickey, Pat image Hickey, Pat
Minority Floor Leader
Republican No. 25 Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 1997-1998, 2011-2016. Resigned January 12, 2016.
Hogan, Joseph M. image Hogan, Joseph M.
Democratic No. 10 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2005-2014. Deceased October 17, 2014.
Horne, William C. image Horne, William C.
Majority Floor Leader
Democratic No. 34 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2003-2014.
Kirkpatrick, Marilyn image Kirkpatrick, Marilyn
Speaker
Democratic No. 1 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2005-2015. Resigned August 19, 2015.
Kirner, Randy image Kirner, Randy
Policy Coordinator
Republican No. 26 Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2011-2016.
Livermore, Peter image Livermore, Peter
Republican No. 40 Carson City, Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2011-2014. Deceased October 20, 2014.
Martin, Andrew image Martin, Andrew
Democratic No. 9 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2013-2014.
Munford, Harvey J. image Munford, Harvey J.
Democratic No. 6 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2005-2016.
Neal, Dina image Neal, Dina
Democratic No. 7 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Ohrenschall, James image Ohrenschall, James
Democratic No. 12 Clark (Part)
Currently Serving
Oscarson, James image Oscarson, James
Republican No. 36 Clark (Part), Lincoln (Part), Nye (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2012-2018
Pierce, Peggy image Pierce, Peggy
Senior Chief Deputy Whip
Democratic No. 3 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2003-2013. Deceased October 10, 2013.
Spiegel, Ellen image Spiegel, Ellen
Democratic No. 20 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2008-2010 and 2012-2020.
Sprinkle, Michael image Sprinkle, Michael
Democratic No. 30 Washoe (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2012-2019
Stewart, Lynn D. image Stewart, Lynn D.
Minority Whip
Republican No. 22 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2007-2016.
Swank, Heidi image Swank, Heidi
Democratic No. 16 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2012-2020.
Thompson, Tyrone image Thompson, Tyrone
Democratic No. 17 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2013-2019. Deceased May 4, 2019.
Wheeler, Jim image Wheeler, Jim
Republican No. 39 Douglas, Lyon (Part), Storey
Currently Serving
Woodbury, Melissa image Woodbury, Melissa
Republican No. 23 Clark (Part)
Served in the Nevada Assembly 2008-2018