Events

Legislative committees and committees affiliated with the Legislature are displayed as links within the panels below.
  • Events (0) for Friday, December 2, 2022
    There are no events today.
  • Upcoming Events (8)
    Monday, December 5, 2022

    9:30 AM
    • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    This is the fourth meeting in calendar year 2022. Please see agenda for details.
      
    Wednesday, December 14, 2022

    9:00 AM
    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the second meeting of calendar year 2022. Please see agenda for details.
      
    Thursday, December 15, 2022

    9:00 AM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the ninth meeting in the calendar year 2022. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Tuesday, January 10, 2023

    4:00 PM

    Cancelled
    **MEETING CANCELED** Is rescheduled for January 12, 2023.
      
    Thursday, January 12, 2023

    9:00 AM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the third meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
    4:00 PM

    • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the second meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. Meeting rescheduled from January 10, 2023. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Thursday, January 19, 2023

    2:00 PM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the seventh meeting of the 2021-2023 Term. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Friday, June 16, 2023

    9:00 AM

    Nevada Girls State
    • The Assembly Chamber of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.