The 2022 Ballot Questions are now available: Question 1, Question 2

Events

Legislative committees and committees affiliated with the Legislature are displayed as links within the panels below.
  • Upcoming Events (19)
    Wednesday, August 17, 2022

    9:00 AM
    • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    This is the sixth meeting in calendar year 2022. Please see agenda for details.
    9:00 AM

    Cancelled
    This meeting has been rescheduled to August 30, 2022
      
    Thursday, August 18, 2022

    9:00 AM
    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the eighth and final meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. Please see the revised agenda and "Work Session Document" for details.
      
    Monday, August 22, 2022

    9:00 AM
    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the fourth and final meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. Please see the agenda and "Work Session Document" for details.
    10:30 AM
    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the fifth meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. **TIME CHANGED** Please see the agenda and "Work Session Document" for details.
      
    Tuesday, August 23, 2022

    9:00 AM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the sixth and final meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
    1:00 PM

    • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the sixth and final meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Wednesday, August 24, 2022

    9:00 AM

    Nevada Department of Sentencing Policy
    • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
      
    Monday, August 29, 2022

    11:00 AM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the seventh meeting in calendar year 2022. The agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
    4:00 PM

    • Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the fourth and final meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim and the Committee's work session. The agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
      
    Tuesday, August 30, 2022

    12:00 PM

    • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    This is the tenth meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Wednesday, August 31, 2022

    1:00 PM

    • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4412 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    This is the fourth and final meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim and the Committee's work session. The agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
      
    Wednesday, September 21, 2022

    2:00 PM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the fourth meeting of the 2021-2023 Term. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Wednesday, October 12, 2022

    9:00 AM

    Regional Transmission Coordination Task Force
    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
      
    Thursday, October 20, 2022

    2:00 PM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the fifth meeting of the 2021-2023 Term. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Tuesday, November 15, 2022

    2:00 PM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the sixth meeting of the 2021-2023 Term. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Tuesday, January 10, 2023

    4:00 PM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the second meeting of the 2021-2022 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Thursday, January 19, 2023

    2:00 PM

    • Room 4401 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
    • Videoconferenced to Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
    This is the seventh meeting of the 2021-2023 Term. The agenda is not yet available.
      
    Friday, June 16, 2023

    9:00 AM

    Nevada Girls State
    • The Assembly Chamber of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.