Nevada Legislature Interim Committees

About the Interim

The Nevada Legislature meets every other year (biennially) for a 120-day session to adopt a two-year budget and to enact new laws or revise existing laws. Following each session, there is a 20-month period between sessions referred to as the "interim." Interim committees are created by the Legislature to work on specific and often complex issues between sessions. Interim committees receive reports and public comment, debate public policy issues, and formulate recommendations for new legislation in the next legislative session.


Committee Tracking Information

Tracking a committee enables you to receive email notifications when an agenda, minutes or reports become available for the committee. Below are instructions for tracking an interim committee using this website.

  • Register and/or Sign In to your Nevada Legislature account.
  • Use the Click to Track button to track a committee.
  • To receive information by mail, navigate to the committee's Staff tab and contact the secretary.

Today's Meetings

There are no meetings scheduled for Saturday, January 25, 2020.

Next Ten Upcoming Meetings

January 2020


This is the first meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Agenda for Committee to Conduct an Interim Study of the Requirements for Reapportionment and Redistricting in the State of Nevada meeting on Monday, January 27, 2020 at 9:30 AM Add to calendar

This is the first meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. **TIME CHANGED** Please see agenda for details.

Agenda for Committee to Conduct an Interim Study Concerning the Costs of Prescription Drugs meeting on Thursday, January 30, 2020 at 10:00 AM Add to calendar

February 2020


This is the first meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the first meeting in calendar year 2020. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the second meeting of the 2019-2021 Term. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the third meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the first meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Meeting rescheduled from February 26, 2020.

Add to calendar

This is the second meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. Meeting rescheduled from January 24, 2020. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the first meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the fourth meeting of the 2019-2020 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

To view more upcoming meetings for this interim, go to the Meetings page.

Past Meetings

To view past meetings for this interim, go to the Meetings page.