Interim Information      
Committee Tracking Information      
Today's Meetings
There are no meetings scheduled for Saturday, January 21, 2017.
Upcoming Meetings
January 2017
Tuesday, January 24, 2017 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Budget Subcommittee
This is the first meeting in calendar year 2017. **REVISED AGENDA** **EMERGENCY ADDITION FROM AGENDA POSTED FOR CANCELLED MEETING ON JANUARY 23, 2017** Please see revised agenda for details.
Wednesday, January 25, 2017 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Budget Subcommittee
This is the second meeting in calendar year 2017. Please see revised agenda for details. **REVISED AGENDA** ** VIDEO CONFERENCE MEETING LOCATION ADDED **
Thursday, January 26, 2017 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Budget Subcommittee
This is the third meeting in calendar year 2017. **REVISED AGENDA** **TIME CHANGED** **TWO ADDITIONS FROM AGENDA POSTED FOR CANCELLED MEETING ON JANUARY 23, 2017** Please see revised agenda for details.
Thursday, January 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM - Interim Finance Committee
This is the first meeting in calendar year 2017. **REVISED AGENDA** ** SECOND TIME CHANGED** Please see revised agenda for details.
Friday, January 27, 2017 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Commission
Agenda not available
This is the first meeting in calendar year 2017. The agenda is not yet available.
Tuesday, January 31, 2017 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Budget Subcommittee
This is the fourth meeting in calendar year 2017. Please see agenda for details.
February 2017
Wednesday, February 1, 2017 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Budget Subcommittee
This is the fifth meeting in calendar year 2017. Please see agenda for details.