Nevada Legislature Interim Committees

About the Interim

The Nevada Legislature meets every other year (biennially) for a 120-day session to adopt a two-year budget and to enact new laws or revise existing laws. Following each session, there is a 20-month period between sessions referred to as the "interim." Interim committees are created by the Legislature to work on specific and often complex issues between sessions. Interim committees receive reports and public comment, debate public policy issues, and formulate recommendations for new legislation in the next legislative session.


Committee Tracking Information

Tracking a committee enables you to receive email notifications when an agenda, minutes or reports become available for the committee. Below are instructions for tracking an interim committee using this website.

  • Register and/or Sign In to your Nevada Legislature account.
  • Use the Click to Track button to track a committee.
  • To receive information by mail, navigate to the committee's Staff tab and contact the secretary.

Today's Meetings

There are no meetings scheduled for Monday, April 22, 2024.

Next Ten Upcoming Meetings

April 2024


This is the fourth meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Agenda for Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission meeting on Tuesday, April 23, 2024 at 9:00 AM Add to calendar

This is the third meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. Please see agenda for details.

Agenda for Joint Interim Standing Committee on the Judiciary meeting on Friday, April 26, 2024 at 9:00 AM Add to calendar

This is the third meeting in calendar year 2024. Meeting rescheduled from April 10, 2024. The agenda is not yet available.

Agenda for Joint Interim Standing Committee on Revenue meeting on Monday, April 29, 2024 at 9:00 AM Add to calendar

This is the third meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

May 2024


This is the first meeting in calendar year 2024. Please see agenda for details.

Agenda for Subcommittee on Education Accountability meeting on Wednesday, May 1, 2024 at 9:00 AM Add to calendar

This is the third meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. The meeting will be held in the Trepp Room at the Parasol Tahoe Community Foundation, Incline Village, Nevada. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the fourth meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the fourth meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the fourth meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

This is the fourth meeting of the 2023-2024 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.

Add to calendar

To view more upcoming meetings for this interim, go to the Meetings page.

Past Meetings

To view past meetings for this interim, go to the Meetings page.