Interim Information      
Committee Tracking Information      
Today's Meetings
There are no meetings scheduled for Friday, December 15, 2017.
Upcoming Meetings
December 2017
Monday, December 18, 2017 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Committee for the Review and Oversight of the Tahoe Regional Planning Agency and the Marlette Lake Water System
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. Meeting rescheduled from November 28, 2017. Please see agenda for details.
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Commission
Meeting not available
This is the fifth meeting in calendar year 2017. Please see agenda for details.
Thursday, December 21, 2017 at 9:00 AM - Committee to Study the Advisability and Feasibility of Treating Certain Traffic and Related Violations as Civil Infractions
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. Please see agenda for details.
January 2018
Thursday, January 4, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Commission on Special License Plates
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the second meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Tuesday, January 9, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Working Group on School Organizational Teams and Other Issues Relating to the Reorganization of Clark County School District
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the second meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 at 1:00 PM - Legislative Committee on Energy
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. **TIME CHANGED** The agenda is not yet available.
Thursday, January 11, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Committee on Health Care
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Friday, January 12, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Committee on Public Lands
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Commission's Audit Subcommittee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Thursday, January 18, 2018 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Monday, January 22, 2018 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Sunset Subcommittee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the second meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Monday, January 22, 2018 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Task Force on Financial Security
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the second meeting of the 2017 - 2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Committee to Study Issues Regarding Affordable Housing
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 at 8:00 AM - Legislative Committee on Child Welfare and Juvenile Justice
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
February 2018
Wednesday, February 7, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Interim Finance Committee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the first meeting in calendar year 2018. The agenda is not yet available.
Friday, February 9, 2018 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Committee on Health Care
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the second meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Thursday, February 15, 2018 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the second meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Sunset Subcommittee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the third meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
March 2018
Thursday, March 15, 2018 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the third meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Sunset Subcommittee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fourth meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Task Force on Financial Security
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the third meeting of the 2017 - 2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
April 2018
Thursday, April 12, 2018 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the second meeting of the 2017-2019 term. The agenda is not yet available.
Thursday, April 19, 2018 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fourth meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Sunset Subcommittee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fifth meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
May 2018
Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fifth meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Monday, May 21, 2018 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Sunset Subcommittee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the sixth meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Monday, May 21, 2018 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Task Force on Financial Security
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fourth meeting of the 2017 - 2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
June 2018
Monday, June 18, 2018 at 8:30 AM - Legislative Commission's Sunset Subcommittee
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the seventh meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Thursday, June 21, 2018 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the sixth meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
July 2018
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 at 8:30 AM - Nevada Task Force on Financial Security
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fifth meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
August 2018
Thursday, August 9, 2018 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the seventh meeting of the 2017-2018 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
September 2018
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the third meeting of the 2017-2019 term. The agenda is not yet available.
October 2018
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fourth meeting of the 2017-2019 term. The agenda is not yet available.
November 2018
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the fifth meeting of the 2017-2019 term. The agenda is not yet available.
December 2018
There are no further meetings scheduled.
January 2019
Thursday, January 10, 2019 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
Meeting not available
This is the sixth meeting of the 2017-2019 term. The agenda is not yet available.
February 2019
There are no meetings scheduled.