Interim Information      
Committee Tracking Information      
Today's Meetings
There are no meetings scheduled for Sunday, July 24, 2016.
Upcoming Meetings
July 2016
This is the fifth meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim. Elko County Commission Chambers, Nannini Administration Building, Suite 102, 540 Court St., Elko, NV. Meeting rescheduled from July 22, 2016. Please see agenda for details.
Thursday, July 28, 2016 at 9:30 AM - Legislative Committee on Education
This is the sixth and final meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim and the Committee's work session. Meeting rescheduled from June 22, 2016. Please see agenda with attached "Work Session Document" for details.
August 2016
Wednesday, August 3, 2016 at 9:30 AM - Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice
Agenda not available
This is the sixth meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
**MEETING CANCELLED** Is rescheduled for August 23, 2016.
Friday, August 19, 2016 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Committee on Public Lands
Agenda not available
This is the sixth and final meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim and the Committee's work session. The agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
Monday, August 22, 2016 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Committee on Energy
Agenda not available
This is the fifth and final meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim and the Committee's work session. The Agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
Monday, August 22, 2016 at 1:00 PM - Legislative Committee on Child Welfare and Juvenile Justice
Agenda not available
This is the fourth and final meeting of the 2015–2016 Interim and the Committee's work session. Meeting rescheduled from August 5, 2016. The agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
Tuesday, August 23, 2016 at 9:00 AM - Interim Finance Committee
Agenda not available
This is the fourth meeting of calendar year 2016. Meeting rescheduled from August 18, 2016. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, August 24, 2016 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Committee on Health Care
Agenda not available
This is the seventh and final meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim. Meeting rescheduled from August 17, 2016. The agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
Friday, August 26, 2016 at 9:00 AM - Legislative Commission’s Subcommittee to Study Water
Agenda not available
This is the sixth meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim and the Subcommittee's work session. The agenda and "Work Session Document" are not yet available.
Wednesday, August 31, 2016 at 9:30 AM - Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice
Agenda not available
This is the seventh meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
September 2016
Tuesday, September 27, 2016 at 9:30 AM - Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice
Agenda not available
This is the eighth meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
October 2016
Wednesday, October 12, 2016 at 9:30 AM - Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice
Agenda not available
This is the ninth meeting of the 2015-2016 Interim. The agenda is not yet available.
Thursday, October 20, 2016 at 9:00 AM - Interim Finance Committee
Agenda not available
This is the fifth meeting in calendar year 2016. The agenda is not yet available.
Wednesday, October 26, 2016 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
The agenda is not yet available.
November 2016
Tuesday, November 15, 2016 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
The agenda is not yet available.
December 2016
There are no meetings scheduled.
January 2017
Thursday, January 5, 2017 at 2:00 PM - Nevada Youth Legislature
Agenda not available
The agenda is not yet available.
February 2017
There are no meetings scheduled.