Bills Signed by the Governor

Loading...

Bills Signed by the Governor - 5 Results

AB1
Makes various changes concerning the abatement or deferment of certain taxes imposed on a new or expanded business. (BDR 32-9)
Chapter 4
Effective June 13, 2013, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2013, for all other purposes. Section 5 of this act expires by limitation on June 30, 2017. Sections 3, 4, 6.5 and 7.3 to 10, inclusive, of this act expire by limitation on June 30, 2032.

AB2
Revises provisions governing class-size reduction. (BDR 34-11)
Chapter 5
Effective June 13, 2013, for the purpose of performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and July 1, 2013, for all other purposes.

SB1
Makes various changes relating to the Clark County Sales and Use Tax Act of 2005. (BDR S-10)
Chapter 1
Effective June 13, 2013 and expires by limitation on October 1, 2025.

SB2
Makes an appropriation to the Millennium Scholarship Trust Fund. (BDR S-12)
Chapter 2
Effective July 1, 2013.

SB3
Revises provisions relating to the Account for Charter Schools. (BDR 34-13)
Chapter 3
Effective June 13, 2013.

Back to top