Nevada Electronic Legislative Information System

Daily Schedule for Friday, February 22, 2019

Show only my meetings
8:00 AM    Assembly Committee on Judiciary
show Room 3138
8:00 AM    Assembly Committee on Ways and Means and Senate Committee on Finance, Subcommittees on K-12/Higher Education/CIP
show Room 3137
8:00 AM    Senate Committee on Finance, Subcommittees on Public Safety, Natural Resources and Transportation and Assembly Committee on Ways and Means, Subcommittees on Public Safety, Natural Resources, and Transportation
show Room 2134
8:00 AM    Senate Committee on Judiciary (Cancelled)
show Room 2135
8:30 AM    Assembly Committee on Government Affairs
show Room 4100
[Upon Adjournment, See Agenda]    Senate Committee on Education
show Room 2134
1:30 PM    Assembly Committee on Commerce and Labor
show Room 4100
[Upon Adjournment, See Agenda]    Assembly Committee on Health and Human Services (Cancelled)
show Room 3138
1:30 PM    Senate Committee on Commerce and Labor (Cancelled)
show Room 2135
1:30 PM    Senate Committee on Government Affairs (Cancelled)
show Room 2149

Upcoming Floor Sessions

Friday, February 22, 2019
Monday, February 25, 2019
Monday, February 25, 2019

Upcoming Deadlines

Monday, February 25, 2019
Joint Standing Rule No. 14 BDR Details
Monday, March 18, 2019
Legislators' Bill Introductions
Monday, March 25, 2019
Joint Standing Rule No. 14 and Other Remaining Bill Introductions
Tuesday, April 02, 2019
Start Closing Budgets
Friday, April 12, 2019
Committee Passage (First House)
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
First House Passage
Wednesday, May 01, 2019
Economic Forum Report Due
Friday, May 03, 2019
Start Resolving Budget Differences
Friday, May 17, 2019
Committee Passage (Second House)
Thursday, May 23, 2019
Finish Budget Differences
Friday, May 24, 2019
Second House Passage
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
Budget Bills Introduced Exempt Bills from Committee