Nevada Electronic Legislative Information System

Daily Schedule for Thursday, April 22, 2021


Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda Participate
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Online

Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda
  • Online
  • Room 2149 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda Participate
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Online

Agenda Participate
  • Room 3143 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Online

Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 2149 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 2144 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda Participate
  • Online
  • Room 3142 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.

Agenda
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Online

Agenda Participate
  • Room 1214 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Online

Upcoming Floor Sessions


Thursday, April 22, 2021

Thursday, April 22, 2021

Upcoming Deadlines


Monday, May 03, 2021
Start Resolving Budget Differences
Tuesday, May 04, 2021
Economic Forum Report Due
Friday, May 14, 2021
Committee Passage (Second House)
Saturday, May 15, 2021
Finish Budget Differences
Friday, May 21, 2021
Second House Passage
Wednesday, May 26, 2021
Budget Bills Introduced Exempt Bills from Committee
Back to top