Daily Schedule for Monday, April 20, 2015
Show only my meetings
8:00 AM    Assembly Committee on Ways and Means
Room 3137 [show details]
  • Room 3137 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
8:00 AM    Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy (Not Scheduled)
Room 2135 [show details]
  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
8:00 AM    Senate Committee on Finance
Room 2134 [show details]
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
9:00 AM    Assembly Committee on Government Affairs (Cancelled)
Room 4100 [show details]
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
1:00 PM    Assembly Committee on Commerce and Labor (Cancelled)
Room 4100 [show details]
  • Room 4100 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4406 of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
1:00 PM    Senate Committee on Judiciary (Not Scheduled)
Room 2134 [show details]
  • Room 2134 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
1:30 PM    Assembly Committee on Health and Human Services (Not Scheduled)
Room 3138 [show details]
  • Room 3138 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
1:30 PM    Senate Committee on Government Affairs (Not Scheduled)
Room 2135 [show details]
  • Room 2135 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
3:15 PM    Assembly Committee on Education (Not Scheduled)
Room 3142 [show details]
  • Room 3142 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
3:30 PM    Senate Committee on Health and Human Services (Not Scheduled)
Room 2149 [show details]
  • Room 2149 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
3:30 PM    Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections (Cancelled)
Room 2144 [show details]
  • Room 2144 of the Legislative Building, 401 S. Carson St., Carson City, NV.
  • Videoconferenced to Room 4412E of the Grant Sawyer State Office Building, 555 E. Washington Ave., Las Vegas, NV.
Upcoming Floor Sessions
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
Upcoming Deadlines
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
First House Passage
Friday, May 01, 2015
Economic Forum Report Due
Monday, May 04, 2015
Start Resolving Budget Differences
Friday, May 15, 2015
Committee Passage (Second House)
Thursday, May 21, 2015
Finish Budget Differences
Friday, May 22, 2015
Second House Passage
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
Budget Bills Introduced; Exempt Bills from Committee