Daily Schedule for Wednesday, February 22, 2017
Show only my meetings
8:00 AM    Assembly Committee on Judiciary
Room 3138
8:00 AM    Assembly Committee on Ways and Means and Senate Committee on Finance, Subcommittees on Human Services
Room 3137
8:00 AM    Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy
Room 2135
8:00 AM    Senate Committee on Finance and Assembly Committee on Ways and Means, Subcommittees on General Government
Room 2134
8:30 AM    Assembly Committee on Government Affairs
Room 4100
1:00 PM    Senate Committee on Government Affairs
Room 2135
1:30 PM    Assembly Committee on Commerce and Labor
Room 4100
1:30 PM    Assembly Committee on Health and Human Services
Room 3138
1:30 PM    Senate Committee on Judiciary
Room 2134
3:15 PM    Assembly Committee on Education
Room 3142
3:30 PM    Senate Committee on Health and Human Services
Room 2149
3:30 PM    Senate Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections
Room 2144
[Upon Adjournment, See Agenda]    Assembly Committee on Commerce and Labor, Subcommittee on Energy
Room 4100
Upcoming Floor Sessions
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
Thursday, February 23, 2017
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
Upcoming Deadlines
Monday, March 20, 2017
Legislators' Bill Introductions
Monday, March 27, 2017
Committees' Bill Introductions
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
Start Closing Budgets
Friday, April 14, 2017
Committee Passage (First House)
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
First House Passage
Monday, May 01, 2017
Economic Forum Report Due
Friday, May 05, 2017
Start Resolving Budget Differences
Friday, May 19, 2017
Committee Passage (Second House)
Thursday, May 25, 2017
Finish Budget Differences
Friday, May 26, 2017
Second House Passage
Wednesday, May 31, 2017
Budget Bills Introduced; Exempt Bills from Committee