Bills Signed by the Governor

Loading...

Bills Signed by the Governor - 2 Results

AB1
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 34-8)
Chapter 2
Sections 12 and 14 of this act effective November 16, 2021. Sections 1 to 5, inclusive, and 13 of this act effective on January 1, 2022, for the purpose of filing for office and for nominating and electing members of the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada, and on January 3, 2023, for all other purposes. Sections 9, 10 and 11 of this act effective on January 1, 2022. Sections 6, 7 and 8 of this act: (a) Become effective November 16, 2021, for the purpose of adopting any regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act, and on January 1, 2022, for all other purposes; and (b) Expire by limitation on December 31, 2022.

SB1
Revises the election districts for members of the Legislature, members of the State Board of Education and Representatives in Congress and the petition districts for certain statewide initiatives or referendums. (BDR 17-9)
Chapter 1
Sections 18 to 21, inclusive, and 24 effective November 16, 2021. Sections 15 to 17, inclusive, effective January 1, 2022. Sections 1 to 7, inclusive, and 22 effective January 1, 2022, for the purposes of filing for office and for nominating and electing members of the Nevada Legislature, and on November 9, 2022, for all other purposes. Section's 8 to 14, inclusive, and 23 effective November 16, 2021, for the purposes of creating each petition district within the State and for determining pursuant to the provisions of NRS 293.127563 the number of signatures required to be gathered from each petition district within the State for a petition for initiative or referendum that proposes a state constitutional amendment or other statewide ballot measure and, notwithstanding any other provisions of law, apply to each such petition that is filed with the Secretary of State pursuant to NRS 295.015: On or after November 16, 2021; or on or after August 1, 2021, and before November 16, 2021, if the petition is amended and the revised petition is filed with the Secretary of State on or after November 16, 2021. On November 16, 2021, for all purposes relating to the members of the State Board of Education. On January 1, 2022, for the purposes of filing for office and for nominating and electing Representatives in the Congress of the United States, and at 9:00 a.m. on January 3, 2023, for all other purposes.

Back to top