Bills Signed by the Governor

Loading...

Bills Signed by the Governor - 4 Results

SB1
Revises provisions relating to capital improvement projects. (BDR S-9)
Chapter 3
Effective July 17, 2020.

SB2
Temporarily authorizes certain changes to eligibility requirements for the Governor Guinn Millennium Scholarship. (BDR 34-13)
Chapter 2
Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, effective July 17, 2020.The amendatory provisions of sections 2, 3 and 4 expire by limitation July 1, 2021. Section 5.5 effective July 1, 2021.

SB3
Revises provisions governing governmental financial administration. (BDR 32-10)
Chapter 4
Sections 2 and 5.5 to 12, inclusive, effective July 20, 2020. Sections 5.5 and 6 expire by limitation June 30, 2021. Section 3 effective July 1, 2021. Sections 2 and 3 expire by limitation June 30, 2023.

SB4
Temporarily revises provisions governing public borrowing. (BDR 30-19)
Chapter 1
Effective July 17, 2020, and expires by limitation June 30, 2021.

Back to top