Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Search 32nd (2020) Special Session Senate and Assembly Journals

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 7/31/2020
Day 2 8/1/2020
Day 3 8/2/2020
Day 4 8/3/2020
Day 5 8/4/2020
Day 6 8/5/2020

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 7/31/2020
Day 2 8/1/2020
Day 4 8/3/2020
Day 5 8/4/2020
Day 6 8/5/2020
Back to top