Bills Signed by the Governor

Loading...

Bills Signed by the Governor - 8 Results

AB1
Ratifies certain technical corrections made to NRS and Statutes of Nevada. (BDR S-12)
Chapter 1
Effective August 2, 2020.

AB2
Revises and clarifies provisions relating to the Legislative Department of the State Government. (BDR 17-17)
Chapter 2
Effective August 2, 2020.

AB3
Makes various changes relating to public safety. (BDR 14-14)
Chapter 4
Effective August 7, 2020.

AB4
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-13)
Chapter 3
Sections 1 to 73, inclusive; 75 to 87, inclusive; and 88 of this act effective August 3, 2020. Section 74 of this act effective on July 1, 2021.

SB1
Authorizes certain courts to grant a stay for certain evictions. (BDR 3-26)
Chapter 5
Effective August 7, 2020.

SB2
Revises provisions relating to peace officers. (BDR 23-11)
Chapter 6
Effective August 7, 2020.

SB3
Revises provisions relating to unemployment compensation. (BDR 53-10)
Chapter 7
Sections 1, 2, 3 and 5 to 17.5 and 18, inclusive, effective August 7, 2020. Section 4 effective 60 days after passage and approval of this act or on the date on which the Administrator of the Employment Security Division of the Department of Employment, Training and Rehabilitation, pursuant to section 17, notifies the Governor and the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau that sufficient resources are available to enable the Division to carry out the amendatory provisions of section 4 of this act, whichever occurs first.

SB4
Revises provisions relating to public health. (BDR 40-16)
Chapter 8
Effective August 11, 2020. Section 30 of this act expires by limitation on the later of the date on which the Governor terminates the emergency described in the Declaration of Emergency for COVID-19 issued on March 12, 2020 or July 1, 2023.

Back to top