Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Search 80th (2019) Session Senate and Assembly Journals

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/4/2019
Day 3 2/6/2019
Day 4 2/7/2019
Day 8 2/11/2019
Day 9 2/12/2019
Day 10 2/13/2019
Day 11 2/14/2019
Day 15 2/18/2019
Day 16 2/19/2019
Day 17 2/20/2019
Day 18 2/21/2019
Day 22 2/25/2019
Day 24 2/27/2019
Day 25 2/28/2019
Day 26 3/1/2019
Day 29 3/4/2019
Day 30 3/5/2019
Day 31 3/6/2019
Day 32 3/7/2019
Day 33 3/8/2019
Day 36 3/11/2019
Day 37 3/12/2019
Day 38 3/13/2019
Day 39 3/14/2019
Day 40 3/15/2019
Day 43 3/18/2019
Day 44 3/19/2019
Day 45 3/20/2019
Day 46 3/21/2019
Day 47 3/22/2019
Day 50 3/25/2019
Day 51 3/26/2019
Day 52 3/27/2019
Day 53 3/28/2019
Day 54 3/29/2019
Day 57 4/1/2019
Day 58 4/2/2019
Day 61 4/5/2019
Day 64 4/8/2019
Day 65 4/9/2019
Day 66 4/10/2019
Day 71 4/15/2019
Day 72 4/16/2019
Day 73 4/17/2019
Day 74 4/18/2019
Day 75 4/19/2019
Day 78 4/22/2019
Day 79 4/23/2019
Day 80 4/24/2019
Day 81 4/25/2019
Day 85 4/29/2019
Day 86 4/30/2019
Day 87 5/1/2019
Day 89 5/3/2019
Day 92 5/6/2019
Day 93 5/7/2019
Day 94 5/8/2019
Day 95 5/9/2019
Day 96 5/10/2019
Day 99 5/13/2019
Day 100 5/14/2019
Day 101 5/15/2019
Day 102 5/16/2019
Day 106 5/20/2019
Day 107 5/21/2019
Day 108 5/22/2019
Day 109 5/23/2019
Day 110 5/24/2019
Day 111 5/25/2019
Day 113 5/27/2019
Day 114 5/28/2019
Day 115 5/29/2019
Day 116 5/30/2019
Day 117 5/31/2019
Day 118 6/1/2019
Day 119 6/2/2019
Day 120 6/3/2019

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/4/2019
Day 2 2/5/2019
Day 3 2/6/2019
Day 4 2/7/2019
Day 8 2/11/2019
Day 9 2/12/2019
Day 10 2/13/2019
Day 11 2/14/2019
Day 12 2/15/2019
Day 15 2/18/2019
Day 16 2/19/2019
Day 18 2/21/2019
Day 19 2/22/2019
Day 22 2/25/2019
Day 24 2/27/2019
Day 26 3/1/2019
Day 29 3/4/2019
Day 30 3/5/2019
Day 31 3/6/2019
Day 32 3/7/2019
Day 36 3/11/2019
Day 37 3/12/2019
Day 38 3/13/2019
Day 39 3/14/2019
Day 40 3/15/2019
Day 43 3/18/2019
Day 44 3/19/2019
Day 45 3/20/2019
Day 46 3/21/2019
Day 50 3/25/2019
Day 52 3/27/2019
Day 54 3/29/2019
Day 57 4/1/2019
Day 58 4/2/2019
Day 64 4/8/2019
Day 67 4/11/2019
Day 71 4/15/2019
Day 72 4/16/2019
Day 73 4/17/2019
Day 74 4/18/2019
Day 75 4/19/2019
Day 78 4/22/2019
Day 79 4/23/2019
Day 81 4/25/2019
Day 85 4/29/2019
Day 86 4/30/2019
Day 87 5/1/2019
Day 89 5/3/2019
Day 92 5/6/2019
Day 93 5/7/2019
Day 94 5/8/2019
Day 95 5/9/2019
Day 96 5/10/2019
Day 100 5/14/2019
Day 101 5/15/2019
Day 102 5/16/2019
Day 106 5/20/2019
Day 107 5/21/2019
Day 108 5/22/2019
Day 109 5/23/2019
Day 110 5/24/2019
Day 113 5/27/2019
Day 114 5/28/2019
Day 115 5/29/2019
Day 116 5/30/2019
Day 117 5/31/2019
Day 118 6/1/2019
Day 119 6/2/2019
Day 120 6/3/2019
Back to top