Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Search 81st (2021) Session Senate and Assembly Journals

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/1/2021
Day 3 2/3/2021
Day 4 2/4/2021
Day 8 2/8/2021
Day 9 2/9/2021
Day 11 2/11/2021
Day 15 2/15/2021
Day 17 2/17/2021
Day 18 2/18/2021
Day 22 2/22/2021
Day 23 2/23/2021
Day 25 2/25/2021
Day 29 3/1/2021
Day 30 3/2/2021
Day 32 3/4/2021
Day 36 3/8/2021
Day 37 3/9/2021
Day 43 3/15/2021
Day 44 3/16/2021
Day 45 3/17/2021
Day 46 3/18/2021
Day 50 3/22/2021
Day 51 3/23/2021
Day 52 3/24/2021
Day 53 3/25/2021
Day 54 3/26/2021
Day 57 3/29/2021
Day 58 3/30/2021
Day 60 4/1/2021
Day 64 4/5/2021
Day 65 4/6/2021
Day 66 4/7/2021
Day 71 4/12/2021
Day 72 4/13/2021
Day 73 4/14/2021
Day 74 4/15/2021
Day 75 4/16/2021
Day 80 4/21/2021
Day 79 4/20/2021
Day 81 4/22/2021
Day 78 4/19/2021
Day 85 4/26/2021
Day 87 4/28/2021
Day 88 4/29/2021
Day 92 5/3/2021
Day 93 5/4/2021
Day 95 5/6/2021
Day 99 5/10/2021
Day 102 5/13/2021
Day 103 5/14/2021
Day 106 5/17/2021
Day 107 5/18/2021
Day 108 5/19/2021
Day 109 5/20/2021
Day 110 5/21/2021
Day 114 5/25/2021
Day 115 5/26/2021
Day 113 5/24/2021
Day 116 5/27/2021
Day 117 5/28/2021
Day 118 5/29/2021
Day 120 5/31/2021

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/1/2021
Day 2 2/2/2021
Day 4 2/4/2021
Day 8 2/8/2021
Day 9 2/9/2021
Day 10 2/10/2021
Day 11 2/11/2021
Day 15 2/15/2021
Day 16 2/16/2021
Day 18 2/18/2021
Day 22 2/22/2021
Day 23 2/23/2021
Day 24 2/24/2021
Day 25 2/25/2021
Day 26 2/26/2021
Day 30 3/2/2021
Day 32 3/4/2021
Day 36 3/8/2021
Day 37 3/9/2021
Day 38 3/10/2021
Day 39 3/11/2021
Day 40 3/12/2021
Day 43 3/15/2021
Day 44 3/16/2021
Day 45 3/17/2021
Day 46 3/18/2021
Day 47 3/19/2021
Day 50 3/22/2021
Day 51 3/23/2021
Day 52 3/24/2021
Day 53 3/25/2021
Day 54 3/26/2021
Day 57 3/29/2021
Day 58 3/30/2021
Day 61 4/2/2021
Day 64 4/5/2021
Day 67 4/8/2021
Day 68 4/9/2021
Day 71 4/12/2021
Day 72 4/13/2021
Day 73 4/14/2021
Day 74 4/15/2021
Day 75 4/16/2021
Day 78 4/19/2021
Day 81 4/22/2021
Day 79 4/20/2021
Day 85 4/26/2021
Day 87 4/28/2021
Day 88 4/29/2021
Day 92 5/3/2021
Day 93 5/4/2021
Day 94 5/5/2021
Day 95 5/6/2021
Day 99 5/10/2021
Day 101 5/12/2021
Day 102 5/13/2021
Day 106 5/17/2021
Day 107 5/18/2021
Day 108 5/19/2021
Day 109 5/20/2021
Day 113 5/24/2021
Day 114 5/25/2021
Day 115 5/26/2021
Day 116 5/27/2021
Day 110 5/21/2021
Day 117 5/28/2021
Day 118 5/29/2021
Day 119 5/30/2021
Day 120 5/31/2021
Back to top