Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/6/2023
Day 3 2/8/2023
Day 4 2/9/2023
Day 8 2/13/2023
Day 9 2/14/2023
Day 10 2/15/2023
Day 11 2/16/2023
Day 15 2/20/2023
Day 16 2/21/2023
Day 17 2/22/2023
Day 18 2/23/2023
Day 22 2/27/2023
Day 25 3/2/2023
Day 29 3/6/2023
Day 30 3/7/2023
Day 31 3/8/2023
Day 32 3/9/2023
Day 36 3/13/2023
Day 37 3/14/2023
Day 38 3/15/2023
Day 39 3/16/2023
Day 43 3/20/2023
Day 44 3/21/2023
Day 45 3/22/2023

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/6/2023
Day 4 2/9/2023
Day 8 2/13/2023
Day 9 2/14/2023
Day 10 2/15/2023
Day 11 2/16/2023
Day 15 2/20/2023
Day 16 2/21/2023
Day 17 2/22/2023
Day 18 2/23/2023
Day 22 2/27/2023
Day 24 3/1/2023
Day 25 3/2/2023
Day 26 3/3/2023
Day 30 3/7/2023
Day 31 3/8/2023
Day 32 3/9/2023
Day 37 3/14/2023
Day 38 3/15/2023
Day 39 3/16/2023
Day 40 3/17/2023
Day 43 3/20/2023
Day 44 3/21/2023
Day 45 3/22/2023
Day 46 3/23/2023
Back to top