Flu & COVID-19 Vaccinations at the Legislative Building

In order to make the 82nd Legislative Session as safe and successful as possible, we want to give everyone an opportunity to get FREE COVID-19 boosters and flu vaccines before the Session gets underway. We will be welcoming Wellness Coaches TM to administer both flu and COVID-19 booster vaccinations at the following dates and times:

Wednesday, January 18, 2023: 8:00 am - 4:00 pm
Thursday, January 19, 2023: 8:00 am to 6:00 pm
Friday, January 20, 2023: 8:00 am to 4:00 pm
Thursday, February 2, 2023: 8:00 am to 6:00 pm
Friday, February 3, 2023: 8:00 am to 4:00 pm

These vaccination clinics will be held in the Lobbyist Room on the first floor of the Legislative Building, and you can make vaccination appointments at LCBNevada.wcusa.com. Appointments are strongly encouraged because they will help us to predict demand and ensure we have an adequate supply of vaccines and supplies on hand, but vaccinations will also be available on a walk-in basis. You can get either or both flu and COVID vaccines, and you can get them at the same time or make two appointments and spread them out over the two weeks, whichever you prefer.

These vaccinations are free and open to the public, so if you have friends or family who need vaccination, please help us get the word out by sharing this announcement far and wide. Please be aware that COVID testing services will not be offered at these clinics.


Requirements for Persons Who Enter the Legislative Building

All visitors are welcome to enter the Legislative Building. Visitors must pass through a metal detector before entering the Legislative Building. The metal detectors are located directly to the front (West side) of the Legislative Building and in the security shed outside the North entrance.

Please see the Buildings Information page for further updates and information.


How to Submit Written Testimony to Committees

Please note that there may be slight variations between houses and/or committees about how or when the committee prefers to receive comments. Refer to the meeting agenda for details specific to the committee.

You may otherwise generally send your written comments to the committee email. Use the Committees menu item, then select the committee to which you'd like to send comments. The committee email is found on the overview tab in a section called Contact Information. 


How to Share Your Opinion on a Bill or Resolution

To share your opinion you must have a registered Nevada Legislature account. Click here to Sign in or Register

Once signed in, you can navigate to the Opinions form by clicking on the Legislation/Bills and Resolutions menu items. This will bring up the Bills and Resolutions list. Find the Bill or Resolution you wish to share your opinion on and click on its name (e.g. AB1). This will bring up your selected Bill or Resolution's Overview tab. Scroll to the bottom of the tab until you see the Public Opinions section and then click on the Submit Opinion or View Opinion Stats link

You will be taken to a form where you can share your opinion and/or view opinion stats. Note whether you are in favor, against, or neutral on the measure, provide your information, and your comment.

We use your address only to determine your legislative district. By looking up your district, we allow legislators to see comments by the constituents in their districts.

Comments submitted through this site are not made part of the public record, but are accessible to all legislators. 


How to View Meetings and Floor Sessions Remotely

Look for the View button anywhere meetings and floor sessions are listed. This will allow you to view either the livestream of the meeting or the video of a meeting that has already occurred. If you'd prefer to watch the meetings and floor sessions via YouTube, you may do so from our YouTube channel.

You do not need to register or sign in to view meetings.


Back to top