Resolutions Delivered to Secretary of State

Loading...

Resolutions Delivered to the Secretary of State - 50 Results

Adopts the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 80th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-990)
File 1

Authorizes additional reimbursement for travel in certain circumstances. (BDR R-989)
File 2

Memorializes former Assemblyman Bob Price. (BDR R-971)
File 10
This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning wildfires. (BDR R-509)
File 46

Commemorates the 150th anniversary of the ratification of the 15th Amendment to the United States Constitution by the Nevada Legislature, the first state in the nation to do so. (BDR R-1079)
File 11

Directs the Legislative Commission to create an interim committee to study the working conditions at licensed brothels. (BDR R-696)
File 47

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study of issues relating to driving under the influence of marijuana. (BDR R-758)
File 48

Celebrates the Life of Assemblyman Odis “Tyrone” Thompson. (BDR R-1291)
File 41

Amends the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 80th Session of the Legislature (BDR R-1296)
File 49

Grants administrative leave to legislative employees in recognition of their service to the 80th Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1297)
File 42

Expresses objection to the transfer of radioactive plutonium to this State. (BDR R-977)
File 34
Effective June 1, 2019.

Urges Congress to reject any expansion in the use of land or exercise of jurisdiction by the United States Air Force in the Desert National Wildlife Refuge. (BDR R-697)
File 35
Effective June 1, 2019.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the recognition of all marriages regardless of gender. (BDR C-690)
File 22
On 2020 ballot.

Expresses support for the Nevada Greater Sage-Grouse Conservation Plan and the Nevada Conservation Credit System and urges the United States Bureau of Land Management to require compensatory mitigation to offset anthropogenic disturbances in accordance with the Nevada Conservation Credit System. (BDR R-511)
File 23
Effective May 28, 2019.

Urges the President and the Congress of the United States to pass acts to combat illegal harvesting and trafficking of human organs. (BDR R-92)
File 24
Effective May 28, 2019.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove the constitutional provisions governing the election and duties of the Board of Regents of the State University and to authorize the Legislature to provide by statute for the governance, control and management of the State University and for the reasonable protection of individual academic freedom. (BDR C-60)
File 14
On 2020 ballot.

Urges Congress to prevent the United States Census Bureau from adding a citizenship question to the 2020 decennial census. (BDR R-279)
File 25
Effective May 28, 2019.

Expresses the opposition of the Nevada Legislature to the proposed expansion of the Fallon Range Training Complex. (BDR R-1099)
File 26
Effective May 28, 2019.

Expresses the opposition of the Nevada Legislature to the elimination of the Nevada State Office of the Bureau of Land Management. (BDR R-506)
File 27
Effective May 28, 2019.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to prospectively increase the required minimum wage paid to employees. (BDR C-1273)
File 40
Return to 2021 Session.

AR1
Adopts the Assembly Standing Rules for the 80th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-984)
File 3
This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

AR2
Provides for the appointment of the Assembly attaches. (BDR R-988)
File 4

AR3
Provides allowances to the members of the Assembly for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-986)
File 5

AR4
Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1040)
File 9

AR5
Adds former Assemblywoman Sadie Hurst to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1253)
File 15

AR6
Adds former Assemblywoman Genie Ohrenschall Daykin to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1252)
File 16

AR7
Designates certain members of the Assembly as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2019-2021 biennium. (BDR R-1289)
File 37
Resolved, That this resolution becomes effective upon adoption.

Directs the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study concerning the development of renewable energy and clean energy resources in this State. (BDR R-117)
File 38
Effective May 30, 2019.

Directs the Legislative Committee on Energy to conduct an interim study to consider alternative solutions for transportation system funding in Nevada. (BDR R-779)
File 43
Effective June 3, 2019.

Provides direction regarding certain legislative measures. (BDR R-1251)
File 12
Effective May 18, 2019.

Expresses support for the role of science in the Lake Tahoe Basin and recognizes the role of the Tahoe Bi-State Executive Committee and the Tahoe Science Advisory Council in guiding environmental preservation, protection, restoration and enhancement efforts in the Lake Tahoe Basin. (BDR R-438)
File 20
Effective May 8, 2019.

Directs the Sunset Subcommittee of the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning professional and occupational licensing boards. (BDR R-520)
File 39
Effective May 30, 2019.

Celebrates the sister state relationship between the State of Nevada and Taiwan. (BDR R-1266)
File 17
Effective April 22, 2019.

Memorializes former Nevada Attorney General and Nevada Supreme Court Chief Justice Charles Springer. (BDR R-1259)
File 21
Effective May 22, 2019.

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study of the requirements for reapportionment and redistricting in the State of Nevada. (BDR R-1271)
File 33
Effective May 24, 2019.

Directs the Legislative Commission to study the feasibility, viability and design of a public healthcare insurance plan that may be offered to all residents of this State. (BDR R-1284)
File 45
Effective June 3, 2019.

Directs the Legislative Commission to appoint a committee to conduct an interim study of issues relating to pretrial release of defendants in criminal cases. (BDR R-1295)
File 50
Effective June 3, 2019.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to expressly provide for the State Board of Pardons Commissioners and revise the duties of the State Board of Pardons Commissioners. (BDR C-567)
File 29
(On 2020 Ballot.)

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide certain rights to voters. (BDR C-55)
File 30
(On 2020 Ballot.)

Expresses the support of the Nevada Legislature for certain federal legislation relating to the conservation of wildlife in this State. (BDR R-507)
File 31
Effective May 24, 2019.

Expresses support for finding innovative transportation solutions in the Lake Tahoe Basin and for the efforts of the Bi-State Working Group on Transportation. (BDR R-441)
File 32
Effective May 24, 2019.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to guarantee equal rights. (BDR C-1278)
File 44
(Return to 2021 Session.)

SR1
Adopts the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 80th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-983)
File 6
Effective February 4, 2019.

SR2
Provides allowances to the members of the Senate for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-985)
File 7
Effective February 4, 2019.

SR3
Provides for the appointment of the Senate Session staff. (BDR R-987)
File 8
Effective February 4, 2019.

SR4
Amends the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 80th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-1256)
File 13
Effective March 25, 2019.

SR5
Inducts Valerie Wiener into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1262)
File 18
Effective April 25, 2019.

SR6
Inducts Barbara Katherine Cegavske into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1261)
File 19
Effective April 25, 2019.

SR7
Provides for the compensation of the clergy in the Senate for the 80th Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1285)
File 28
Effective May 24, 2019.

SR8
Designates certain members of the Senate as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2019-2021 biennium. (BDR R-1290)
File 36
Effective May 29, 2019.

Back to top