Vetoed Bills

Vetoed Bills - 28 Results

Revises provisions governing probation. (BDR 14-806)
Vetoed 6/1/2011

Revises provisions governing credits for offenders sentenced for certain crimes. (BDR 16-634)
Vetoed 6/16/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions governing programs of nutrition in public schools. (BDR 34-191)
Vetoed 6/16/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Creates an advisory committee to develop recommendations for the funding of highways in this State. (BDR S-180)
Vetoed 6/13/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions regarding the establishment and maintenance of a reserve account for payment of the outstanding bonds of a school district. (BDR 30-114)
Vetoed 4/4/2011

Makes various changes concerning fines and settlement agreements relating to occupational safety and health. (BDR 53-100)
Vetoed 6/1/2011

Revises provisions relating to the issuance of a citation for certain occupational safety and health violations. (BDR 53-101)
Vetoed 6/1/2011

Revises provisions governing foreclosures on property. (BDR 9-668)
Vetoed 6/16/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions governing the restoration of civil rights for ex-felons. (BDR 16-687)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions governing insurance. (BDR 57-516)
Vetoed 6/6/2011

Revises provisions governing certain programs for renewable energy. (BDR 58-849)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Expands prohibition on employers taking certain actions to prohibit, punish or prevent employees from engaging in politics or becoming candidates for public office with certain exceptions. (BDR 53-63)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions governing the attendance of pupils and graduation from high school. (BDR 34-1140)
Vetoed 6/1/2011

Provides for an audit of the fiscal costs of the death penalty. (BDR S-1103)
Vetoed 6/6/2011

Makes various changes to provisions governing early childhood care and education. (BDR 38-739)
Vetoed 6/15/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning state ports of entry. (BDR S-892)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises the legislative districts from which members of the Senate and Assembly are elected and revises the districts from which Representatives of Congress are elected. (BDR 17-1287)
Vetoed 5/31/2011

Ensures sufficient funding for K-12 public education for the 2011-2013 biennium. (BDR S-1292)
Vetoed 5/16/2011

Revises the interim committee structure of the Legislature. (BDR 17-942)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Provides requirements governing payment for the provision of certain services and care to patients and reports relating to those services and care. (BDR 40-192)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions relating to the work schedules of certain employees of the Department of Corrections. (BDR 23-699)
Vetoed 6/16/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Authorizes the imposition of an administrative penalty against an employer under certain circumstances. (BDR 53-165)
Vetoed 6/13/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Creates the Task Force on Employee Misclassification. (BDR 53-164)
Vetoed 6/14/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions relating to common-interest communities. (BDR 10-264)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Provides for redistricting of election districts in Carson City and the Cities of Henderson, Reno and Sparks, contingent upon voter approval. (BDR S-731)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises provisions governing redevelopment agencies. (BDR 22-937)
Vetoed 6/15/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Creates a subcommittee of the Legislative Committee on Health Care to oversee the implementation of federal health care reform in this State. (BDR 40-695)
Vetoed 6/17/2011
Returns to next legislative session

Revises the legislative districts from which members of the Senate and Assembly are elected and revises the districts from which Representatives of Congress are elected. (BDR 17-1289)
Vetoed 5/14/2011

Back to top