Conference Committees

June 04, 2011 at 3:00 PM
Room 3161

June 06, 2011 at 2:15 PM
Room 3161

June 05, 2011 at 6:30 PM
Room 3133C

June 04, 2011 at 4:00 PM
Room 1113B

June 03, 2011 at 3:00 PM
Room 3161

May 30, 2011 at 2:30 PM
Room 1113B (small conference room behind Assembly Sergeant At Arms)

June 05, 2011 at 4:00 PM
Room 3161

June 06, 2011 at 9:30 PM
Room 1113B

June 01, 2011 at 2:30 PM
Room 3161

June 06, 2011 at 8:00 AM
Room 1219 - Sen. Wiener's Office

June 06, 2011 at 12:00 PM
Room 3143

June 06, 2011 at 2:30 PM
Room 3161

June 03, 2011 at 4:30 PM
Room 3161

June 04, 2011 at 2:00 PM
Room 1113B

May 31, 2011 at 3:00 PM
Room 3161

June 05, 2011 at 6:30 PM
Room 1219 - Sen. Wiener's Office

June 05, 2011 at 1:00 PM
Room 3161

May 31, 2011 at 2:00 PM
Room 1113B (small conference room behind Assembly Sergeant At Arms)

June 05, 2011 at 3:30 PM
Room 3161

June 06, 2011 at 2:00 PM
Room 3161

June 05, 2011 at 10:00 PM
Room 3143

June 06, 2011 at 8:00 AM
Room 3161

June 05, 2011 at 7:15 PM
Room 1113B

June 06, 2011 at 3:45 PM
Room 3161

June 05, 2011 at 4:00 PM
Room 1113B

June 05, 2011 at 6:00 PM
Room 3161

June 03, 2011 at 8:30 AM
Room 1113B

Back to top