Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Search 76th (2011) Session Senate and Assembly Journals

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/7/2011
Day 2 2/8/2011
Day 3 2/9/2011
Day 4 2/10/2011
Day 8 2/14/2011
Day 10 2/16/2011
Day 11 2/17/2011
Day 12 2/18/2011
Day 15 2/21/2011
Day 16 2/22/2011
Day 17 2/23/2011
Day 18 2/24/2011
Day 22 2/28/2011
Day 23 3/1/2011
Day 24 3/2/2011
Day 25 3/3/2011
Day 29 3/7/2011
Day 31 3/9/2011
Day 32 3/10/2011
Day 36 3/14/2011
Day 38 3/16/2011
Day 39 3/17/2011
Day 40 3/18/2011
Day 43 3/21/2011
Day 44 3/22/2011
Day 45 3/23/2011
Day 46 3/24/2011
Day 47 3/25/2011
Day 50 3/28/2011
Day 51 3/29/2011
Day 52 3/30/2011
Day 53 3/31/2011
Day 57 4/4/2011
Day 59 4/6/2011
Day 60 4/7/2011
Day 64 4/11/2011
Day 67 4/14/2011
Day 68 4/15/2011
Day 71 4/18/2011
Day 72 4/19/2011
Day 73 4/20/2011
Day 75 4/22/2011
Day 78 4/25/2011
Day 79 4/26/2011
Day 80 4/27/2011
Day 81 4/28/2011
Day 85 5/2/2011
Day 87 5/4/2011
Day 90 5/7/2011
Day 92 5/9/2011
Day 93 5/10/2011
Day 94 5/11/2011
Day 96 5/13/2011
Day 97 5/14/2011
Day 99 5/16/2011
Day 101 5/18/2011
Day 102 5/19/2011
Day 103 5/20/2011
Day 106 5/23/2011
Day 108 5/25/2011
Day 109 5/26/2011
Day 110 5/27/2011
Day 111 5/28/2011
Day 112 5/29/2011
Day 113 5/30/2011
Day 114 5/31/2011
Day 115 6/1/2011
Day 116 6/2/2011
Day 117 6/3/2011
Day 118 6/4/2011
Day 119 6/5/2011
Day 120 6/6/2011

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/7/2011
Day 3 2/9/2011
Day 5 2/11/2011
Day 8 2/14/2011
Day 10 2/16/2011
Day 11 2/17/2011
Day 12 2/18/2011
Day 15 2/21/2011
Day 16 2/22/2011
Day 17 2/23/2011
Day 18 2/24/2011
Day 19 2/25/2011
Day 23 3/1/2011
Day 24 3/2/2011
Day 25 3/3/2011
Day 26 3/4/2011
Day 29 3/7/2011
Day 31 3/9/2011
Day 32 3/10/2011
Day 33 3/11/2011
Day 36 3/14/2011
Day 37 3/15/2011
Day 38 3/16/2011
Day 39 3/17/2011
Day 40 3/18/2011
Day 43 3/21/2011
Day 44 3/22/2011
Day 45 3/23/2011
Day 46 3/24/2011
Day 47 3/25/2011
Day 50 3/28/2011
Day 51 3/29/2011
Day 53 3/31/2011
Day 54 4/1/2011
Day 57 4/4/2011
Day 61 4/8/2011
Day 64 4/11/2011
Day 68 4/15/2011
Day 71 4/18/2011
Day 72 4/19/2011
Day 73 4/20/2011
Day 75 4/22/2011
Day 78 4/25/2011
Day 79 4/26/2011
Day 80 4/27/2011
Day 81 4/28/2011
Day 82 4/29/2011
Day 85 5/2/2011
Day 89 5/6/2011
Day 92 5/9/2011
Day 93 5/10/2011
Day 94 5/11/2011
Day 96 5/13/2011
Day 99 5/16/2011
Day 100 5/17/2011
Day 101 5/18/2011
Day 102 5/19/2011
Day 103 5/20/2011
Day 106 5/23/2011
Day 108 5/25/2011
Day 109 5/26/2011
Day 110 5/27/2011
Day 111 5/28/2011
Day 112 5/29/2011
Day 113 5/30/2011
Day 114 5/31/2011
Day 115 6/1/2011
Day 116 6/2/2011
Day 117 6/3/2011
Day 118 6/4/2011
Day 119 6/5/2011
Day 120 6/6/2011
Back to top