Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Search 78th (2015) Session Senate and Assembly Journals

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/2/2015
Day 2 2/3/2015
Day 4 2/5/2015
Day 8 2/9/2015
Day 9 2/10/2015
Day 10 2/11/2015
Day 11 2/12/2015
Day 15 2/16/2015
Day 16 2/17/2015
Day 17 2/18/2015
Day 18 2/19/2015
Day 19 2/20/2015
Day 22 2/23/2015
Day 23 2/24/2015
Day 24 2/25/2015
Day 25 2/26/2015
Day 29 3/2/2015
Day 30 3/3/2015
Day 31 3/4/2015
Day 32 3/5/2015
Day 33 3/6/2015
Day 36 3/9/2015
Day 37 3/10/2015
Day 38 3/11/2015
Day 39 3/12/2015
Day 40 3/13/2015
Day 43 3/16/2015
Day 44 3/17/2015
Day 45 3/18/2015
Day 46 3/19/2015
Day 47 3/20/2015
Day 50 3/23/2015
Day 51 3/24/2015
Day 52 3/25/2015
Day 53 3/26/2015
Day 54 3/27/2015
Day 57 3/30/2015
Day 58 3/31/2015
Day 59 4/1/2015
Day 60 4/2/2015
Day 61 4/3/2015
Day 64 4/6/2015
Day 65 4/7/2015
Day 66 4/8/2015
Day 67 4/9/2015
Day 68 4/10/2015
Day 71 4/13/2015
Day 72 4/14/2015
Day 73 4/15/2015
Day 74 4/16/2015
Day 75 4/17/2015
Day 78 4/20/2015
Day 79 4/21/2015
Day 80 4/22/2015
Day 81 4/23/2015
Day 85 4/27/2015
Day 86 4/28/2015
Day 87 4/29/2015
Day 88 4/30/2015
Day 89 5/1/2015
Day 92 5/4/2015
Day 93 5/5/2015
Day 94 5/6/2015
Day 95 5/7/2015
Day 96 5/8/2015
Day 99 5/11/2015
Day 100 5/12/2015
Day 101 5/13/2015
Day 102 5/14/2015
Day 103 5/15/2015
Day 104 5/16/2015
Day 105 5/17/2015
Day 106 5/18/2015
Day 107 5/19/2015
Day 108 5/20/2015
Day 109 5/21/2015
Day 110 5/22/2015
Day 113 5/25/2015
Day 114 5/26/2015
Day 115 5/27/2015
Day 116 5/28/2015
Day 117 5/29/2015
Day 118 5/30/2015
Day 119 5/31/2015
Day 120 6/1/2015

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/2/2015
Day 4 2/5/2015
Day 5 2/6/2015
Day 8 2/9/2015
Day 10 2/11/2015
Day 12 2/13/2015
Day 16 2/17/2015
Day 17 2/18/2015
Day 18 2/19/2015
Day 19 2/20/2015
Day 22 2/23/2015
Day 23 2/24/2015
Day 25 2/26/2015
Day 29 3/2/2015
Day 30 3/3/2015
Day 31 3/4/2015
Day 32 3/5/2015
Day 33 3/6/2015
Day 36 3/9/2015
Day 37 3/10/2015
Day 38 3/11/2015
Day 39 3/12/2015
Day 40 3/13/2015
Day 43 3/16/2015
Day 44 3/17/2015
Day 46 3/19/2015
Day 47 3/20/2015
Day 50 3/23/2015
Day 51 3/24/2015
Day 53 3/26/2015
Day 57 3/30/2015
Day 59 4/1/2015
Day 61 4/3/2015
Day 64 4/6/2015
Day 66 4/8/2015
Day 68 4/10/2015
Day 72 4/14/2015
Day 73 4/15/2015
Day 74 4/16/2015
Day 75 4/17/2015
Day 78 4/20/2015
Day 79 4/21/2015
Day 82 4/24/2015
Day 85 4/27/2015
Day 86 4/28/2015
Day 87 4/29/2015
Day 88 4/30/2015
Day 89 5/1/2015
Day 92 5/4/2015
Day 93 5/5/2015
Day 94 5/6/2015
Day 95 5/7/2015
Day 96 5/8/2015
Day 99 5/11/2015
Day 101 5/13/2015
Day 102 5/14/2015
Day 103 5/15/2015
Day 106 5/18/2015
Day 107 5/19/2015
Day 108 5/20/2015
Day 109 5/21/2015
Day 110 5/22/2015
Day 114 5/26/2015
Day 115 5/27/2015
Day 116 5/28/2015
Day 117 5/29/2015
Day 118 5/30/2015
Day 119 5/31/2015
Day 120 6/1/2015
Back to top