Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Search 77th (2013) Session Senate and Assembly Journals

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/4/2013
Day 2 2/5/2013
Day 3 2/6/2013
Day 4 2/7/2013
Day 8 2/11/2013
Day 9 2/12/2013
Day 10 2/13/2013
Day 15 2/18/2013
Day 16 2/19/2013
Day 17 2/20/2013
Day 18 2/21/2013
Day 22 2/25/2013
Day 23 2/26/2013
Day 24 2/27/2013
Day 25 2/28/2013
Day 26 3/1/2013
Day 29 3/4/2013
Day 30 3/5/2013
Day 32 3/7/2013
Day 33 3/8/2013
Day 36 3/11/2013
Day 37 3/12/2013
Day 38 3/13/2013
Day 40 3/15/2013
Day 43 3/18/2013
Day 44 3/19/2013
Day 45 3/20/2013
Day 46 3/21/2013
Day 50 3/25/2013
Day 51 3/26/2013
Day 52 3/27/2013
Day 53 3/28/2013
Day 57 4/1/2013
Day 58 4/2/2013
Day 59 4/3/2013
Day 60 4/4/2013
Day 65 4/9/2013
Day 66 4/10/2013
Day 68 4/12/2013
Day 71 4/15/2013
Day 72 4/16/2013
Day 73 4/17/2013
Day 74 4/18/2013
Day 75 4/19/2013
Day 78 4/22/2013
Day 79 4/23/2013
Day 80 4/24/2013
Day 81 4/25/2013
Day 85 4/29/2013
Day 86 4/30/2013
Day 87 5/1/2013
Day 92 5/6/2013
Day 93 5/7/2013
Day 95 5/9/2013
Day 99 5/13/2013
Day 101 5/15/2013
Day 102 5/16/2013
Day 103 5/17/2013
Day 104 5/18/2013
Day 106 5/20/2013
Day 107 5/21/2013
Day 108 5/22/2013
Day 109 5/23/2013
Day 110 5/24/2013
Day 113 5/27/2013
Day 114 5/28/2013
Day 115 5/29/2013
Day 116 5/30/2013
Day 117 5/31/2013
Day 118 6/1/2013
Day 119 6/2/2013
Day 120 6/3/2013

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/4/2013
Day 3 2/6/2013
Day 4 2/7/2013
Day 8 2/11/2013
Day 10 2/13/2013
Day 11 2/14/2013
Day 15 2/18/2013
Day 17 2/20/2013
Day 18 2/21/2013
Day 22 2/25/2013
Day 23 2/26/2013
Day 24 2/27/2013
Day 26 3/1/2013
Day 29 3/4/2013
Day 30 3/5/2013
Day 32 3/7/2013
Day 33 3/8/2013
Day 36 3/11/2013
Day 37 3/12/2013
Day 38 3/13/2013
Day 40 3/15/2013
Day 43 3/18/2013
Day 45 3/20/2013
Day 46 3/21/2013
Day 50 3/25/2013
Day 51 3/26/2013
Day 52 3/27/2013
Day 53 3/28/2013
Day 58 4/2/2013
Day 59 4/3/2013
Day 60 4/4/2013
Day 61 4/5/2013
Day 65 4/9/2013
Day 66 4/10/2013
Day 68 4/12/2013
Day 71 4/15/2013
Day 72 4/16/2013
Day 73 4/17/2013
Day 74 4/18/2013
Day 78 4/22/2013
Day 79 4/23/2013
Day 80 4/24/2013
Day 81 4/25/2013
Day 82 4/26/2013
Day 86 4/30/2013
Day 88 5/2/2013
Day 92 5/6/2013
Day 94 5/8/2013
Day 95 5/9/2013
Day 100 5/14/2013
Day 102 5/16/2013
Day 103 5/17/2013
Day 104 5/18/2013
Day 106 5/20/2013
Day 107 5/21/2013
Day 108 5/22/2013
Day 109 5/23/2013
Day 110 5/24/2013
Day 111 5/25/2013
Day 113 5/27/2013
Day 114 5/28/2013
Day 115 5/29/2013
Day 116 5/30/2013
Day 117 5/31/2013
Day 118 6/1/2013
Day 119 6/2/2013
Day 120 6/3/2013
Back to top