Journals

Each house of the Nevada Legislature publishes a daily journal of its proceedings, which is the only official record of floor activity. While the journals are not verbatim transcriptions of floor activity, they do record all official actions taken on measures pending before the chambers and frequently include the text of remarks made by legislators, especially as it relates to legislative intent on specific legislation.

Search 79th (2017) Session Senate and Assembly Journals

Senate

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/6/2017
Day 2 2/7/2017
Day 3 2/8/2017
Day 4 2/9/2017
Day 8 2/13/2017
Day 9 2/14/2017
Day 10 2/15/2017
Day 11 2/16/2017
Day 15 2/20/2017
Day 16 2/21/2017
Day 17 2/22/2017
Day 18 2/23/2017
Day 22 2/27/2017
Day 23 2/28/2017
Day 24 3/1/2017
Day 25 3/2/2017
Day 29 3/6/2017
Day 30 3/7/2017
Day 31 3/8/2017
Day 32 3/9/2017
Day 33 3/10/2017
Day 36 3/13/2017
Day 37 3/14/2017
Day 38 3/15/2017
Day 39 3/16/2017
Day 40 3/17/2017
Day 43 3/20/2017
Day 44 3/21/2017
Day 45 3/22/2017
Day 46 3/23/2017
Day 47 3/24/2017
Day 50 3/27/2017
Day 51 3/28/2017
Day 52 3/29/2017
Day 53 3/30/2017
Day 57 4/3/2017
Day 58 4/4/2017
Day 61 4/7/2017
Day 64 4/10/2017
Day 65 4/11/2017
Day 66 4/12/2017
Day 71 4/17/2017
Day 72 4/18/2017
Day 73 4/19/2017
Day 74 4/20/2017
Day 75 4/21/2017
Day 78 4/24/2017
Day 79 4/25/2017
Day 80 4/26/2017
Day 81 4/27/2017
Day 82 4/28/2017
Day 85 5/1/2017
Day 86 5/2/2017
Day 87 5/3/2017
Day 88 5/4/2017
Day 89 5/5/2017
Day 92 5/8/2017
Day 93 5/9/2017
Day 95 5/11/2017
Day 99 5/15/2017
Day 100 5/16/2017
Day 101 5/17/2017
Day 102 5/18/2017
Day 103 5/19/2017
Day 106 5/22/2017
Day 107 5/23/2017
Day 108 5/24/2017
Day 109 5/25/2017
Day 110 5/26/2017
Day 113 5/29/2017
Day 114 5/30/2017
Day 115 5/31/2017
Day 116 6/1/2017
Day 117 6/2/2017
Day 118 6/3/2017
Day 119 6/4/2017
Day 120 6/5/2017

Assembly

Legislative Day Date
Day 1 2/6/2017
Day 2 2/7/2017
Day 4 2/9/2017
Day 5 2/10/2017
Day 8 2/13/2017
Day 9 2/14/2017
Day 10 2/15/2017
Day 11 2/16/2017
Day 15 2/20/2017
Day 16 2/21/2017
Day 17 2/22/2017
Day 18 2/23/2017
Day 19 2/24/2017
Day 22 2/27/2017
Day 23 2/28/2017
Day 24 3/1/2017
Day 25 3/2/2017
Day 26 3/3/2017
Day 30 3/7/2017
Day 31 3/8/2017
Day 32 3/9/2017
Day 33 3/10/2017
Day 36 3/13/2017
Day 37 3/14/2017
Day 38 3/15/2017
Day 39 3/16/2017
Day 40 3/17/2017
Day 43 3/20/2017
Day 44 3/21/2017
Day 45 3/22/2017
Day 46 3/23/2017
Day 47 3/24/2017
Day 50 3/27/2017
Day 52 3/29/2017
Day 53 3/30/2017
Day 57 4/3/2017
Day 58 4/4/2017
Day 59 4/5/2017
Day 64 4/10/2017
Day 65 4/11/2017
Day 66 4/12/2017
Day 67 4/13/2017
Day 68 4/14/2017
Day 71 4/17/2017
Day 72 4/18/2017
Day 73 4/19/2017
Day 74 4/20/2017
Day 75 4/21/2017
Day 78 4/24/2017
Day 79 4/25/2017
Day 80 4/26/2017
Day 81 4/27/2017
Day 82 4/28/2017
Day 86 5/2/2017
Day 89 5/5/2017
Day 92 5/8/2017
Day 93 5/9/2017
Day 95 5/11/2017
Day 96 5/12/2017
Day 99 5/15/2017
Day 100 5/16/2017
Day 101 5/17/2017
Day 102 5/18/2017
Day 103 5/19/2017
Day 106 5/22/2017
Day 107 5/23/2017
Day 108 5/24/2017
Day 109 5/25/2017
Day 110 5/26/2017
Day 113 5/29/2017
Day 114 5/30/2017
Day 115 5/31/2017
Day 116 6/1/2017
Day 117 6/2/2017
Day 118 6/3/2017
Day 119 6/4/2017
Day 120 6/5/2017
Back to top