Resolutions Delivered to Secretary of State

Loading...

Resolutions Delivered to the Secretary of State - 41 Results

Adopts the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-941)
File 7

Provides for the voluntary transfer of a portion of Legislators' salaries to the State General Fund. (BDR R-958)
File 8

Honors Nevadans who have lost their lives in the Global War on Terrorism. (BDR R-202)
File 13
This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

Memorializes former Assemblyman Joseph “Joe” Michael Hogan, Sr. (BDR R-1260)
File 26
This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

Memorializes former Assemblyman Peter L. “Pete” Livermore. (BDR R-1259)
File 27
This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

Recognizes the strategic partnership and bond of friendship with, and expresses the Nevada Legislature's support for, the State of Israel. (BDR R-525)
File 28
Effective May 19, 2015.

Urges the United States Congress and the United States Fish and Wildlife Service to take certain actions to reduce the impact of common ravens on the greater sage grouse and desert tortoise populations in this State. (BDR R-33)
File 22
Effective May 13, 2015.

Urges Congress to facilitate the payment of contractors who completed hazardous fuels treatment projects in the Lake Tahoe Basin pursuant to contracts with the Nevada Fire Safe Council. (BDR R-431)
File 10
Effective March 12, 2015

Urges Congress to enact legislation allowing states to establish daylight saving time as the standard time throughout the calendar year. (BDR R-583)
File 29
Effective May 21, 2015

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require approval of certain initiative measures by a two-thirds vote. (BDR C-916)
File 36
Return to 2017 Session.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the compensation of certain elected officers. (BDR C-1068)
File 40
Return to 2017 Session.

AR1
Adopts the Assembly Standing Rules for the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-943)
File 1

AR2
Provides for the appointment of Assembly attaches. (BDR R-946)
File 2

AR3
Provides allowances to the members of the Assembly for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-947)
File 3

AR4
Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1203)
File 9

AR5
Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1262)
File 12

AR6
Provides for the appointment of additional attaches for the Assembly. (BDR R-1267)
File 14

AR7
Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1271)
File 19

AR8
Adds former Assemblyman Alan H. Glover to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1274)
File 23

AR9
Adds former Assemblywoman Peggy Pierce to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1273)
File 24

Designates certain members of the Assembly as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2015-2017 biennium. (BDR R-1285)
File 38
This resolution becomes effective upon passage.

Encourages education of medical care providers and first responders regarding caring for persons with Alzheimer's disease. (BDR R-237)
File 34

Temporarily suspends subparagraph (1) of paragraph (d) of subsection 1 of Joint Standing Rule No. 14.2. (BDR R-1261)
File 11
Effective March 18, 2015.

Authorizes the State Public Works Division of the Department of Administration to receive and use federal grant money for the demolition of the field maintenance shop at the Nevada National Guard Henderson Armory. (BDR R-1263)
File 15

Commemorates the 30th anniversary of the sister-state relationship between the State of Nevada and Taiwan. (BDR R-1265)
File 21

Urges Congress to enact legislation transferring title to certain public lands to the State of Nevada in accordance with the report prepared by the Nevada Land Management Task Force. (BDR R-451)
File 30
Effective May 21, 2015.

Urges Congress to require the sharing of federal receipts from commercial activity on certain public lands with the State of Nevada and its counties. (BDR R-452)
File 31
Effective May 21, 2015.

Urges Congress to enact the Marketplace Fairness Act. (BDR R-98)
File 32
Effective May 21, 2015.

Expresses support for the 2014 Nevada Greater Sage-Grouse Conservation Plan developed by the Sagebrush Ecosystem Council and urges the United States Fish and Wildlife Service not to list the greater sage-grouse as endangered or threatened under the Endangered Species Act of 1973. (BDR R-480)
File 33
Effective May 21, 2015.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to preserve the right to hunt, trap and fish in this State. (BDR C-1001)
File 20
(Return to 2017 Session)

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to limit the total amount of certain property taxes that may be levied on real property. (BDR C-1004)
File 41
(Return to 2017 Session)

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to expand the rights guaranteed to victims of crime. (BDR C-952)
File 37
(Return to 2017 Session)

Urges Congress to enact comprehensive immigration reform. (BDR R-1266)
File 35
Effective May 28, 2015.

SR1
Adopts the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-942)
File 4

SR2
Provides allowances to the members of the Senate for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-944)
File 5

SR3
Recognizes the appointment of the Senate session staff. (BDR R-945)
File 6

SR4
Inducts Dean Rhoads into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1268)
File 16

SR5
Inducts Terry Care into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1270)
File 17

SR6
Inducts Randolph J. Townsend into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1269)
File 18

SR7
Adopts new Standing Rules of the Senate for the remainder of the 78th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-1275)
File 25

SR8
Designates certain members of the Senate as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2015-2017 biennium. (BDR R-1286)
File 39

Back to top