Resolutions Delivered to Secretary of State

Loading...

Resolutions Delivered to the Secretary of State - 48 Results

Adopts the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 76th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-945)
File 1

Provides for the voluntary transfer of a portion of Legislators' salaries to the State General Fund. (BDR R-961)
File 5

Urges proactive protection and restoration of the population and habitat of the greater sage grouse in Nevada. (BDR R-214)
File 25

Expresses support for economic development in Nevada in the sectors of logistics, supply chain management and renewable energy technology. (BDR R-174)
File 11

Honors Nevadans who have lost their lives in the Global War on Terrorism. (BDR R-736)
File 15

Makes a formal request for the Governor to establish an open, fair and public process to fill the vacancy in the Office of United States Senator. (BDR R-1283)
File 22

Memorializes Nevada's first acupuncturist, Dr. Yee Kung Lok. (BDR R-547)
File 24

Directs the Legislative Committee on Health Care to create a task force to develop a state plan to address Alzheimer's disease. (BDR R-1296)
File 42

Amends the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 76th Session of the Nevada Legislature to extend the second House passage deadline from May 27, 2011, until May 30, 2011. (BDR R-1297)
File 34

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning the structure and operations of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1312)
File 45

Provides for compensation of the clergy and the coordinator of the clergy for services rendered to the Assembly and Senate. (BDR R-1321)
File 47

Proposes to amend certain provisions of the Nevada Constitution related to the assessment and collection of property taxes to authorize the Legislature to provide by law for the calculation of the taxable value of improvements to real property upon the transfer, sale or conveyance of the property. (BDR C-402)
File 31
Return to 2013 Session.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing the convening and conduct of special sessions and the duration and adjournment of regular and special sessions. (BDR C-139)
File 33
On 2012 ballot.

Urges the Federal Government to engage in discussions regarding the mitigation and containment of water contamination in Nevada which resulted from certain nuclear activities that were conducted in this State by the Federal Government. (BDR R-895)
File 46
Effective June 16, 2011.

Requests that Congress and the Federal Highway Administration designate a portion of U.S. Route 93 as an interstate highway. (BDR R-171)
File 38
Effective June 2, 2011.

Urges Congress to enact the Unemployment Insurance Solvency Act of 2011. (BDR R-1282)
File 21
Effective April 26, 2011.

AR1
Adopts the Assembly Standing Rules for the 76th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-949)
File 6

AR2
Provides for the appointment of Assembly attaches. (BDR R-950)
File 7

AR3
Provides allowances for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-951)
File 8

AR4
Adds former Assemblyman John C. Carpenter to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1272)
File 12

AR5
Adds former Assemblyman Marcia de Braga to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1271)
File 13

AR6
Adds former Legislative Counsel Frank W. Daykin to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1273)
File 14

AR7
Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1277)
File 17

AR8
Provides for the appointment of additional attaches for the Assembly. (BDR R-1279)
File 18

AR9
Designates Assembly members of the Legislative Commission for the 2011-2013 biennium. (BDR R-1298)
File 39

Expresses appreciation to the staff of the Assembly. (BDR R-1320)
File 48

Expresses support for the Pine Forest Wilderness Study Area Working Group. (BDR R-213)
File 35

Directs certain state agencies to investigate whether the State could potentially receive compensation from the Federal Government for environmental contamination in Nevada as a result of certain military exercises, nuclear weapons testing and other activities conducted by the Federal Government in Nevada. (BDR R-247)
File 36

Recognizes the month of February 2011 as a month to honor the contributions of Ronald Reagan. (BDR R-835)
File 9

Rejects Initiative Petition No. 1. (BDR R-1153)
File 10

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning the laws of this State governing the protection of children. (BDR R-364)
File 43

Memorializes Marie H. Soldo. (BDR R-240)
File 16

Memorializes Milton D. Glick, President of the University of Nevada, Reno. (BDR R-1281)
File 20

Memorializes Enos LeRoy Arrascada, respected attorney and community leader. (BDR R-32)
File 23

Memorializes former state Senator Raymond C. Shaffer. (BDR R-30)
File 28

Memorializes career military officer Colonel Jerry Bussell (Retired). (BDR R-554)
File 29

Memorializes visionary leader, businessman and advocate Edmundo “Eddie” Escobedo, Sr. (BDR R-858)
File 30

Commends Casey Family Programs for its dedication in helping children and families. (BDR R-1305)
File 37

Urges Congress to enact legislation to require the Secretary of the Interior to convey ownership of certain land to the State of Nevada to help fund education. (BDR R-90)
File 41
Effective June 6, 2011.

Urges Congress to take certain actions concerning federal public lands in Nevada. (BDR R-212)
File 32
Effective May 27, 2011.

Urges Congress to enact legislation or take other appropriate action to expedite and streamline the requirements for conducting mining operations in this State. (BDR R-1035)
File 27
Effective May 19, 2011.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to create an intermediate appellate court. (BDR C-1013)
File 26
Return to 2013 Session.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove the separate tax rate and manner of assessing and distributing the tax on mines and the proceeds of mines. (BDR C-1151)
File 44
Return to 2013 Session

SR1
Adopts the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 76th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-946)
File 2

SR2
Provides allowances for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-948)
File 3

SR3
Provides for the appointment of the Senate session staff. (BDR R-947)
File 4

SR4
Inducts William J. Raggio into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1278)
File 19

SR5
Designates Senate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2011-2013 biennium. (BDR R-1299)
File 40

Back to top