Resolutions Delivered to Secretary of State

Loading...

Resolutions Delivered to the Secretary of State - 48 Results

Adopts the Joint Standing Rules of the Senate and Assembly for the 81st Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-888)
File 4

Memorializes former Assemblyman and Senator Alan H. Glover. (BDR R-1158)
File 29
This resolution becomes effective upon adoption.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to add and revise terms relating to persons with certain conditions for whose benefit certain public entities are supported by the State. (BDR C-477)
File 36
Return to 2023 Session.

Recognizes that the health of forests, rangelands and soils are inextricably linked to the quantity and quality of water. (BDR R-112)
File 18
Effective May 14, 2021.

Urges various actions relating to the protection and conservation of land and water. (BDR R-775)
File 30
Effective May 21, 2021.

Urges Congress and the President of the United States to protect certain land containing swamp cedars in Spring Valley. (BDR R-467)
File 19
Effective May 14, 2021.

Urges the Congress of the United States to pass the National Infrastructure Bank Act of 2020. (BDR R-765)
File 15
Effective May 4, 2021.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to prospectively increase the required minimum wage paid to employees. (BDR C-1273)
File 41
On 2022 ballot.

Proposes to amend the Ordinance of the Nevada Constitution and the Nevada Constitution to remove language authorizing the use of slavery and involuntary servitude as a criminal punishment. (BDR C-496)
File 24
Return to 2023 Session.

AR1
Adopts the Standing Rules of the Assembly for the 81st Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-892)
File 5

AR2
Provides for the appointment of the Assembly attaches. (BDR R-893)
File 6

AR3
Provides allowances to the members of the Assembly for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-894)
File 7

AR4
Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-950)
File 8

AR5
Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1142)
File 13
This resolution becomes effective upon adoption.

AR6
Adds former Nevada Assembly Sergeant at Arms Robin Bates to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1156)
File 21
This resolution becomes effective upon adoption.

AR7
Adds former Deputy Research Director of the Research Division of the Legislative Counsel Bureau Marsheilah D. Lyons to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1157)
File 33

AR8
Designates certain members of the Assembly as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2021-2023 biennium. (BDR R-1179)
File 38

AR9
Accepts and adopts the report and recommendation of the Assembly Committee on Election Contests regarding the contest of the 2020 General Election for Assembly District 21. (BDR R-1189)
File 42

Expresses appreciation for assistance provided to the Nevada Legislature with its response to the global COVID-19 pandemic during the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1186)
File 43

Expresses appreciation to the staff of the Legislative Counsel Bureau for their service during the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1188)
File 44

Expresses appreciation to the staff of the Assembly for their service during the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1183)
File 45

Urges employers in this State to provide personal protective equipment to employees to prevent the spread of COVID-19. (BDR R-189)
File 14
Effective March 30, 2021.

Honors former State Senator Allison Copening for her advocacy for organ donation and expresses the support of the Nevada Legislature for the development of a transplant institute. (BDR R-66)
File 10
Effective March 9, 2021.

Memorializes former state Senator Joseph M. Neal, Jr. (BDR R-901)
File 9
Effective February 25, 2021.

Urges certain actions to address the public health crisis in Nevada. (BDR R-966)
File 22
Effective May 18, 2021.

Recognizes the 200th anniversary of Greek independence. (BDR R-1141)
File 12
Effective March 25, 2021.

Expresses support for the identification of key transportation priorities for the Lake Tahoe Basin. (BDR R-365)
File 23
Effective May 18, 2021.

Expresses support for the Nevada System of Higher Education to work collaboratively in its science and research efforts addressing the needs of the Lake Tahoe Basin. (BDR R-364)
File 34
Effective May 25, 2021.

Creates a joint special committee to conduct a study concerning innovation zones. (BDR R-1148)
File 39
Effective May 28, 2021.

Celebrates the sister-state relationship between the State of Nevada and Taiwan, which continues to enhance trade, educational and cultural relations. (BDR R-1151)
File 28
Effective May 20, 2021.

Creates an interim committee to conduct an investigation into matters relating to reapportionment and redistricting in the State of Nevada. (BDR R-1166)
File 40
Effective May 28, 2021.

Memorializes former District Court Judge Don P. Chairez. (BDR R-1140)
File 35
Effective May 25, 2021.

Expresses support for the creation of a retirement plan for spouses of members of the military. (BDR R-384)
File 25
Effective May 18, 2021.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove the constitutional provisions governing the election and duties of the Board of Regents of the State University and to authorize the Legislature to provide by statute for the governance of the State University and for the auditing of public institutions of higher education in this State. (BDR C-944)
File 26
Effective May 18, 2021.

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to guarantee equal rights. (BDR C-1278)
File 11
(On 2022 Ballot.)

Urges Congress to protect the public lands including and adjacent to Sunrise Mountain, Frenchman Mountain and Rainbow Gardens. (BDR R-101)
File 17
Effective May 10, 2021.

Urges Congress to ratify the Convention on the Elimination of all Forms of Discrimination Against Women. (BDR R-969)
File 27
Effective May 18, 2021.

Expresses the priority of the timely completion of the Tahoe East Shore Trail extension project and urges Congress to provide federal funding for completion of the project. (BDR R-363)
File 16
Effective May 10, 2021.

SR1
Adopts the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 81st Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-889)
File 1
Effective February 1, 2021.

SR2
Provides allowances to the members of the Senate for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-890)
File 2
Effective February 1, 2021.

SR3
Provides for the appointment of the Senate Session staff. (BDR R-891)
File 3
Effective February 1, 2021.

SR4
Provides for the compensation of the clergy in the Senate for the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1161)
File 20
Effective May 17, 2021.

SR5
Inducts David R. Parks into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1165)
File 31
Effective May 24, 2021.

SR6
Inducts Mark Amodei into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1164)
File 32
Effective May 24, 2021.

SR7
Designates certain members of the Senate as regular and alternate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2021-2023 biennium. (BDR R-1178)
File 37
Effective May 27, 2021.

SR8
Expresses appreciation to the staff of the Legislative Counsel Bureau for their service during the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1187)
File 46
Effective May 31, 2021.

SR9
Expresses appreciation for assistance provided to the Nevada Legislature with its response to the global COVID-19 pandemic during the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1185)
File 47
Effective May 31, 2021.

Expresses appreciation to the staff of the Senate for their service during the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature. (BDR R-1184)
File 48
Effective May 31, 2021.

Back to top